EP0828710 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF (THIO-)CARBONIC/CARBAMIC ACID 2-PYRROLIDONYL-3-ESTERS, THIO ESTERS AND AMIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeneca Limited 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states ZENECA LIMITED 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COX, John, Michael 412a Finchampstead Road Wokingham, Berkshire RG11 3RD / GB | 02 /
GILLEN, Kevin, James Flat 18, Church Mews, Cookha Road Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 7EH / GB | 03 /
ELLIS, Russell, Martin 83 Evedon Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 7NQ / GB | 04 /
VOHRA, Shaheen, Khatoon 81a Bean Oak Road Wokingham, Berkshire RG40 1RJ / GB | 05 /
SMITH, Stephen, Christopher 132 Towngate, Netherthong Huddersfield, Yorkshire HD7 2XZ / GB | 06 /
MATTHEWS, Ian, Richard 9 Emm Close Wokingham, Berkshire RG11 1HH / GB | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Waterman, John Richard, et al Syngenta Limited - IP Department Jealott's Hill International Research Centre P.O. Box 3538 Bracknell Berkshire RG42 6YA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | Waterman, John Richard, et al Intellectual Property Department, ZENECA Agrochemicals, Jealott's Hill Research Station, P.O. Box 3538 Bracknell, Berkshire RG42 6YA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96915099.4 | 13.05.1996 | [1998/12] | WO1996GB01150 | Priority number, date | GB19950010744 | 26.05.1995 Original published format: GB 9510744 | [1998/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9637466 | Date: | 28.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0828710 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/273 | [1998/12] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2-PYRROLIDONYL-3-ESTERN, -THIOESTERN UND AMIDEN DER (THIO-)KOHLENSÄURE/CARBAMINSÄURE | [1998/12] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF (THIO-)CARBONIC/CARBAMIC ACID 2-PYRROLIDONYL-3-ESTERS, THIO ESTERS AND AMIDES | [1998/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION 2-PYRROLIDONYL-3-ESTERS, DE THIOESTERS ET D'AMIDES DE L'ACIDE (THIO-)CARBONIQUE/CARBAMIQUE | [1998/12] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 20.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9413652 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [X] 11-13 * page 64, line 3 - line 17 * * claim 12 *; | [PX]WO9533719 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-13 * the whole document * * claims 8,9,12 *; | [X] - K. KATAYAMA ET. AL., "Synthesis and Antiinflammatory Activities of 3-(3,5-Di-tert-butyl-4-hydroxybenzylidene)pyrrolidin-ones", J. MED. CHEM. (1996), 39(9), 1864-71 CODEN: JMCMAR;ISSN: 0022-2623, (1987), vol. 30, no. 11, pages 1995 - 1998, XP002008920 [X] 1-10 * scheme 1 * | [X] - OKAWARA, TADASHI ET AL, "Convenient syntheses of cyclic carboxamides from.alpha.,.beta.,.gamma.,.delta. and.epsilon.-halocarboxamides under phase transfer conditions", CHEM. PHARM. BULL. (1982), 30(4), 1225-33 CODEN: CPBTAL;ISSN: 0009-2363, (1982), XP000576121 [X] 1-10 * page 1228 * * chart 5 * |