EP0778956 - POLARIZING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1997/25] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIKMET, Rifat, Ata, Mustafa Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [1997/25] | Representative(s) | Baele, Ingrid Albertina F.M. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/25] | Baele, Ingrid Albertina F.M. Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 96915113.3 | 31.05.1996 | [1997/25] | WO1996IB00523 | Priority number, date | EP19950201770 | 29.06.1995 Original published format: EP 95201770 | [1997/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9701779 | Date: | 16.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0778956 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0778956 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30 | [1997/25] | CPC: |
G02B5/3025 (EP,US);
G02B5/3083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/25] | Title | German: | POLARISATIONSELEMENT | [1997/25] | English: | POLARIZING ELEMENT | [1997/25] | French: | ELEMENT POLARISANT | [1997/25] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/38] | 19.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.09.2003 | [2004/33] | Cited in | International search | [X]US5184248 (DE VAAN ADRIANUS J S M [NL], et al); | [X]US5359455 (OISHI NORIJI [JP]); | [X]US5212586 (VAN DELDEN JAY S [US]); | [X]US5408354 (HOSOKAWA TADATOSHI [JP]); | [PX]US5440424 (WU JIN-JEI [JP], et al) | Examination | EP0474237 |