EP0826290 - ZONE-BASED ASSET TRACKING AND CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensormatic Electronics Corporation 6600 Congress Avenue Boca Raton, Florida 33487 / US | [2004/02] |
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states Sensormatic Electronics Corporation 951 Yamato Road Boca Raton, Florida 33431-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHARRAFI, Touraj 3432 Pine Haven Circle Boca Raton, FL 33431 / US | 02 /
GRIMES, Mark 2635 N.E. 15th Street Pompano Beach, FL 33062 / US | 03 /
ROMER, Kevin, D. 19520 Preserve Drive Boca Raton, FL 33498 / US | [1998/10] | Representative(s) | Hafner, Dieter, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Hafner, Dieter, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2005/27] | Hafner, Dieter, Dr., et al Hafner & Partner GbR Patent-/Rechtsanwälte Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1998/10] | Hafner, Dieter, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Hafner & Stippl, Patentanwälte, Ostendstrasse 132 90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96915525.8 | 06.05.1996 | [1998/10] | WO1996US06351 | Priority number, date | US19950437313 | 09.05.1995 Original published format: US 437313 | [1998/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9636186 | Date: | 14.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0826290 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0826290 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q1/00, G06K17/00, G07C9/00 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
G08B13/14 (EP,US);
G06K17/0022 (EP,US);
G07C9/28 (EP,US);
G08B13/2408 (EP,US);
G08B13/2434 (EP,US);
G08B13/2462 (EP,US);
G08B13/2471 (EP,US);
G08B13/2474 (EP,US);
G08B13/248 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/10] | H04Q1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1998/10] | Title | German: | ZONENBASIERTE GÜTERORDNUNG UND STEUERSYSTEM | [1998/10] | English: | ZONE-BASED ASSET TRACKING AND CONTROL SYSTEM | [1998/10] | French: | SYSTEME DE CONTROLE ET DE SUIVI PAR ZONE | [1998/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.1997 | Search fee paid | 27.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 09.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO8200377 (MASTIFF SECURITY SYST LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-9,17-23,30-32 * page 1, line 5 - line 21 * * page 2, line 13 - line 25 * * page 5, line 10 - page 8, line 17 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 10-16,24-29; | [Y]GB1260113 (TELEDICTOR LTD) [Y] 12,13,24-29 * page 1, line 41 - line 55 * * page 1, line 76 - page 2, line 28 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US4656463 (ANDERS FRANK W [US], et al) [Y] 14-16 * column 4, line 1 - line 56 * * column 7, line 65 - column 10, line 21 * | [X] - OLLIVIER M M, "TIRIS: A VEHICLE TRACKING SYSTEM USING PASSIVE RADIO TRANSPONDERS", IEE COLLOQUIUM ON VEHICLE LOCATION AND FLEET MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, (1993), XP000914379 [X] 30-34 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4636950 (CASWELL ROBERT L [US], et al); | [Y]US4598275 (ROSS CLIVE [CA], et al); | [Y]US4952928 (CARROLL GARY T [US], et al); | [Y]US5321396 (LAMMING MICHAEL G [GB], et al); | [Y]US5276444 (MCNAIR BRUCE E [US]); | [A]US4118693 (NOVIKOFF EUGENE B); | [A]US5062151 (SHIPLEY ROBERT T [US]); | [A]US3805265 (LESTER R) |