EP0835287 - USE OF SILICONE-MODIFIED EPOXY RESINS AS POTTING COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/16] | USE OF SILICONE-MODIFIED EPOXY RESINS AS SEALING COMPOUND | ||
[2000/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFANDER, Werner Eschenweg 10 D-70734 Fellbach / DE | 02 /
JENNRICH, Irene Birkmannsweiler Strasse 19 D-71364 Winnenden / DE | 03 /
SPITZ, Richard Römersteinstrasse 56 D-72766 Reutlingen / DE | 04 /
KÖHLER, Uwe Austrasse 18 D-71686 Remseck / DE | 05 /
SCHULER, Siegfried Martinstrasse 17 D-72829 Engstingen / DE | [1998/16] | Application number, filing date | 96915973.0 | 05.06.1996 | [1998/16] | WO1996DE00993 | Priority number, date | DE1995123897 | 30.06.1995 Original published format: DE 19523897 | [1998/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9702321 | Date: | 23.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0835287 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0835287 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08L63/00, C08K9/06, H01B3/40, C08K3/00, // (C08K3/00, 3:34, 3:36) | [1998/16] | CPC: |
H01L23/296 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (KR);
C08G59/306 (EP,US);
C08K3/00 (KR);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C08K9/06 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/013, C08L83/10 (US,EP);
C08K9/06, C08L83/10 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1998/16] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON SILICON-MODIFIZIERTEN EXPOXIDHARZEN ALS VERGUSSMASSE | [1998/16] | English: | USE OF SILICONE-MODIFIED EPOXY RESINS AS POTTING COMPOUND | [2000/30] | French: | UTILISATION DE RESINES EPOXY MODIFIEES AU SILICONE COMME MASSES DE SCELLEMENT | [1998/16] |
Former [1998/16] | USE OF SILICONE-MODIFIED EPOXY RESINS AS SEALING COMPOUND | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 28.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 18.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1745545 (VNI I P KI ELEKTROVOZOSTROJENI) [A] 1,3,5-7 * claims 1,2 *; | [X]US4701482 (ITOH KUNIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5,10,11 * column 2, line 41 - line 55 * * column 3, line 36 - line 40 * * column 3, line 56 - line 61 * * column 4, line 10 - line 56 * * column 5, paragraph 2 * * column 7, paragraph 1 * * example -; claim 1 *; | [AP]EP0673957 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [AP] 1,5,6,10 * page 13, lines 1-5 * * page 29; example 15; table 3 ** claims 1,5,11-13 * |