EP0840628 - AUTOMATIC WITHDRAWAL OF PISTON ROD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLITMOSE, Lars, Peter Gardrehoejvej 20 DK-2820 Gentofte / DK | [1998/20] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Einar Tronier, et al Novo Nordisk A/S, Health Care Patents, Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Hansen, Einar Tronier, et al Novo Nordisk A/S, Health Care Patents, Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [1998/20] | Hansen, Einar Tronier, et al c/o Novo Nordisk A/S, Patent Department, Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Application number, filing date | 96916020.9 | 03.06.1996 | [1998/20] | WO1996DK00236 | Priority number, date | DK19950000625 | 02.06.1995 Original published format: DK 62595 | [1998/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9638190 | Date: | 05.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0840628 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0840628 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24, // A61M5/315 | [1998/20] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/20] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHER KOLBENSTANGENRÜCKZUG | [2001/34] | English: | AUTOMATIC WITHDRAWAL OF PISTON ROD | [1998/20] | French: | RETRAIT AUTOMATIQUE DE TIGE DE PISTON | [1998/20] |
Former [1998/20] | AUTOMATISCHER KOLBENSTANGENRUCKZUG | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 02.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/20] | 08.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0064858 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [A]DE4419235 (BRAEGER THOMAS [DE]) |