EP0826024 - AUTOMATIC DISHWASHING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING ALUMINUM SALTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
ES
FR
IT
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | For:DE
ES
FR
IT
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANGEVAARE, Petrus, Adrianus, J., M. Architect mutterkade 52 NL-2552 ZL Den Haag / NL | 02 /
GARY, Richard, Gerald 436-67th Street West New York, NJ 07093 / US | [1998/10] | Representative(s) | Rosen Jacobson, Frans Lucas M., et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | Rosen Jacobson, Frans Lucas M., et al Unilever N.V., Patent Division, P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 96916115.7 | 13.05.1996 | [1998/10] | WO1996EP02130 | Priority number, date | US19950444502 | 19.05.1995 Original published format: US 444502 | US19950444503 | 19.05.1995 Original published format: US 444503 | [1998/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9636687 | Date: | 21.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0826024 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/39, C11D3/02, C11D3/395, C11D3/16 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
C11D3/046 (EP);
C11D11/0082 (EP);
C11D11/0094 (EP);
C11D3/0073 (EP);
C11D3/2075 (EP);
C11D3/2079 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/10] | Title | German: | ALUMINIUMSALZE ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR GESCHIRRSPÜLMASCHINEN | [1998/10] | English: | AUTOMATIC DISHWASHING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING ALUMINUM SALTS | [1998/10] | French: | COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT DES SELS D'ALUMINIUM POUR LE LAVAGE AUTOMATIQUE DE LA VAISSELLE | [1998/10] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 01.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/13] | 04.11.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.08.1998 | 31.05.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0011984 (S.C. JOHNSON & SON) [X] 1,2,6 * example 3; claims 1,2 *; | [X]GB2172897 (COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY) [X] 1,2,6,8,10-13,15 * page 9, lines 45-59; claims 5,15 *; | [A]JPH03255199 ; | [A]US3701736 (A.E. AUSTIN ET AL.); | [A]US3803040 (F. W. GRAY); | [A]US3600317 (A.E. LINTNER) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 01, Database accession no. 92-002750, XP002014624 & JPH03255199 A 19911114 (NIPPON CONTACT LENS) [A] 1 * abstract * |