EP0855031 - OPPOSABLE-ELEMENT ASSAY DEVICE EMPLOYING CONDUCTIVE BARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE DIAGNOSTICS, INC. 225 Baypointe Parkway San Jose California 95134-1622 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE DIAGNOSTICS, INC. 225 Baypointe Parkway San Jose California 95134-1622 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANDLER, Howard, M. 76A Princes Point Road Yarmouth, ME 04096 / US | [1998/31] | Representative(s) | Ede, Eric Fitzpatricks 1 Blythswood Square Glasgow G2 4AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | Ede, Eric Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 96916618.0 | 23.05.1996 | [1998/31] | WO1996US07663 | Priority number, date | US19950458132 | 02.06.1995 Original published format: US 458132 | [1998/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9638727 | Date: | 05.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0855031 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/558 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
B01L3/5055 (EP,US);
B01L3/5023 (EP,US);
G01N30/90 (EP,US);
G01N33/5302 (EP,US);
G01N33/54366 (EP,US);
G01N33/54386 (EP);
G01N33/54388 (US);
G01N33/558 (EP);
B01L2300/0825 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0406 (EP,US);
G01N30/02 (EP,US);
G01N30/30 (EP,US);
Y10S435/805 (EP,US);
Y10S435/81 (EP,US);
Y10S435/97 (EP,US);
Y10S435/973 (EP,US);
Y10S435/975 (EP,US);
Y10S436/805 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
G01N30/02, B01D15/3804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/31] | Title | German: | TESTVORRICHTUNG MIT GEGENEINANDER RICHTBASEN ELEMENTE, DAS EINE LEITENDE BARRIERE VERWENDET | [1998/31] | English: | OPPOSABLE-ELEMENT ASSAY DEVICE EMPLOYING CONDUCTIVE BARRIER | [1998/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ESSAI A ELEMENT OPPOSABLE DOTE D'UNE BARRIERE CONDUCTRICE | [1998/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 23.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/31] | 02.03.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4717656 (SWANLJUNG CARL G P [SE]); | [A]US4826759 (GUIRE PATRICK E [US], et al); | [XP]US5468648 (CHANDLER HOWARD M [US]) |