EP0828823 - HERPES SIMPLEX TYPE 1 PROTEASE MUTANTS AND VECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states MERCK & CO., INC. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REGISTER, R.Bruce 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 02 /
SHAFER, Jules A. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Hiscock, Ian James, et al European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | Hiscock, Ian James, et al European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 96916676.8 | 28.05.1996 | [1998/12] | WO1996US07795 | Priority number, date | US19950457558 | 01.06.1995 Original published format: US 457558 | [1998/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9638546 | Date: | 05.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0828823 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/86, C12N9/50, C12N5/10, C12N7/00, // C12N15/38 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP);
C12N7/00 (EP);
C12N9/503 (EP);
C12N2710/16643 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/12] | C12N7/01, C12N15/00, C12N15/38, C12N1/21, C12N5/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/12] | Title | German: | HERPES SIMPLEX TYP I PROTEASEMUTANTEN UND VEKTOREN | [1998/12] | English: | HERPES SIMPLEX TYPE 1 PROTEASE MUTANTS AND VECTORS | [1998/12] | French: | MUTANTS DE LA PROTEASE DU VIRUS DE L'HERPES SIMPLEX DU TYPE 1 ET VECTEURS ASSOCIES | [1998/12] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 02.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 22.03.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/38] | 24.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0514830 (ARCH DEV CORP) [X] 1-16 * table 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0176170 (MERIEUX INST) [A] 16-30 * page 5 - page 14 *; | [PX] - REGISTER R.B. & SHAFER J.A., "A facile system for construction of HSV-1 variants: site directed mutation of the UL26 protease gene in HSV-1", J. VIROL. METHODS, (19960405), vol. 57, no. 2, pages 181 - 193, XP002086857 [PX] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0166-0934(95)01984-7 | International search | [Y]WO9205263 | [X] - JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, Vol. 68, No. 9, issued September 1994, DESAI et al., "The Size and Symmetry of B Capsids of Herpes Simplex Virus Type 1 are Determined by the Gene Products of the UL26 Open Reading Frame", pages 5365-5374. | [X] - JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, Vol. 68, No. 6, issued June 1994, GAO et al., "The Protease of Herpes Simplex Virus Type 1 is Essential for Functional Capsid Formation and Viral Growth", pages 3702-3712. | [Y] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., Vol. 89, issued March 1992, LIU et al., "Differentiation of Multiple Domains in the Herpes Simplex Virus 1 Protease Encoded by the UL26 Gene", pages 2076-2080. | [Y] - VIROLOGY, Vol. 197, issued 1993, CUNNINGHAM et al., "A Cosmid-Based System for Constructing Mutants of Herpes Simplex Virus Type 1", pages 116-124. |