EP0828779 - WATER-SOLUBLE POLYMERS AND COMPOSITIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California Mail Stop D412 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | For all designated states Smith, Barbara F. 1274 46th Street Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | For all designated states Robison, Thomas W. 348 Kimberly Lane Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | For all designated states Gohdes, Joel W. 1877-B 22nd Street Los Alamos, NM 85744 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA Mail Stop D412 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | ||
For all designated states Smith, Barbara F. 1274 46th Street Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | |||
For all designated states Robison, Thomas W. 348 Kimberly Lane Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | |||
For all designated states Gohdes, Joel W. 1877-B 22nd Street Los Alamos, NM 85744 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Barbara, F. 1274 46th Street Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | 02 /
ROBISON, Thomas, W. 348 Kimberly Lane Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | 03 /
GOHDES, Joel, W. 1877-B 22nd Street Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/12] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96916867.3 | 30.05.1996 | [1998/12] | WO1996US08188 | Priority number, date | US19950454451 | 30.05.1995 Original published format: US 454451 | [1998/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9638493 | Date: | 05.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0828779 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0828779 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/06, C08F226/02, C08F226/04, C08F20/04, C08F20/56, C08F28/02, C08F24/00, C08G73/02 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
C02F1/683 (EP,US);
C08F226/00 (EP,US);
C08G73/0206 (EP,US);
C02F2101/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/12] | C08G73/06, C08F226/02, C08F226/04, C08F20/04, C08F20/56, C08F28/02, C08F24/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/12] | Title | German: | WASSERLÖSLICHE POLYMERE UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1998/12] | English: | WATER-SOLUBLE POLYMERS AND COMPOSITIONS THEREOF | [1998/12] | French: | POLYMERES HYDROSOLUBLES ET LEURS COMPOSITIONS | [1998/12] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 19.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 11.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2000 | BE | 13.09.2000 | FI | 13.09.2000 | IT | 13.09.2000 | NL | 13.09.2000 | DK | 13.12.2000 | PT | 13.12.2000 | SE | 13.12.2000 | GR | 15.12.2000 | IE | 30.05.2001 | LU | 30.05.2001 | MC | 31.05.2001 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/39] | AT | 13.09.2000 | |
BE | 13.09.2000 | ||
FI | 13.09.2000 | ||
NL | 13.09.2000 | ||
DK | 13.12.2000 | ||
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
GR | 15.12.2000 | ||
IE | 30.05.2001 | ||
LU | 30.05.2001 | ||
MC | 31.05.2001 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 13.09.2000 | |
BE | 13.09.2000 | ||
FI | 13.09.2000 | ||
NL | 13.09.2000 | ||
DK | 13.12.2000 | ||
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
GR | 15.12.2000 | ||
IE | 30.05.2001 | ||
LU | 30.05.2001 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 13.09.2000 | |
BE | 13.09.2000 | ||
FI | 13.09.2000 | ||
NL | 13.09.2000 | ||
DK | 13.12.2000 | ||
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
IE | 30.05.2001 | ||
LU | 30.05.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 13.09.2000 | |
BE | 13.09.2000 | ||
FI | 13.09.2000 | ||
NL | 13.09.2000 | ||
DK | 13.12.2000 | ||
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
IE | 30.05.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 13.09.2000 | |
BE | 13.09.2000 | ||
FI | 13.09.2000 | ||
NL | 13.09.2000 | ||
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
IE | 30.05.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | AT | 13.09.2000 | |
BE | 13.09.2000 | ||
FI | 13.09.2000 | ||
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
IE | 30.05.2001 | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT | 13.09.2000 | |
BE | 13.09.2000 | ||
FI | 13.09.2000 | ||
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | BE | 13.09.2000 | |
FI | 13.09.2000 | ||
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | BE | 13.09.2000 | |
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/22] | BE | 13.09.2000 | |
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/18] | PT | 13.12.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - DZHERAYAN ET AL., "Spetrophotometric determination of copper with the use of 4-(2-pyridylazo)resorcinol after membrane preconcentration with a water-soluble polymer", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19931227), vol. 119, no. 26, Database accession no. 285368, XP002058257 [X] 11 * abstract * | [ ] - ZH. ANAL. KHIM., (1993), vol. 48, no. 5, pages 881 - 888 | International search | [X]US3932363 (LEHMANN WOLFGANG, et al); | [X]US4251597 (EMMONS WILLIAM D, et al); | [X]US4650846 (HERWEH JOHN E [US]); | [X]US4977239 (KAMUTZKI WALTER [DE], et al) |