EP0830278 - PERSONAL PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuester, Stephen Michael 1 Rosebank Cottages Bloxham, Banbury Oxon OX15 4NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states Kuester, Stephen Michael 1 Rosebank Cottages Bloxham, Banbury, Oxon OX15 4NA / GB | ||
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states Kuester, Stephen, Michael 20 Farraxton Square Camp Hill, Northampton NN4 9RQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/13] | Representative(s) | Coles, Graham Frederick, et al Graham Coles & Co. 24 Seeleys Road Beaconsfield, Bucks. HP9 1SZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Coles, Graham Frederick, et al Graham Coles & Co. 24 Seeleys Road Beaconsfield Buckinghamshire HP9 1SZ / GB | ||
Former [1998/13] | Coles, Graham Frederick Graham Coles & Co. 24 Seeleys Road Beaconsfield Buckinghamshire HP9 1SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96917559.5 | 07.06.1996 | [1998/13] | WO1996GB01348 | Priority number, date | GB19950011505 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: GB 9511505 | [1998/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9640546 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0830278 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0830278 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B62B9/14, F24F3/16 | [1998/13] | CPC: |
B62B9/142 (EP,US);
B62B9/14 (KR);
F24F8/10 (EP,US);
F24F8/108 (EP,KR,US);
B62B2204/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/13] | Title | German: | PERSONENSCHUTZ | [1998/13] | English: | PERSONAL PROTECTION | [1998/13] | French: | PROTECTION DE PERSONNE | [1998/13] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/13] | 14.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.07.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 07.06.2000 | MC | 30.06.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2002/42] | MC | 30.06.2000 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3193322 (HINES RUTH C) [Y] 2-4,10,11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3227484 (MERCLEAN THEODORE S) [Y] 9 * figure - *; | [A]EP0339902 (APRICA KASSAI KK [JP]); | [XY]DE4241233 (STRAUBINGER GERHARD [DE]) [X] 1,5-8,12 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,9-11 |