EP0830721 - OPTICAL AMPLIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCENAC, Dominique 25E York Road, Martlesham Heath Ipswich, Suffolk IP5 7TL / GB | [1998/13] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Simon Christopher, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A. BT Centre 81 Newgate Street, London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Roberts, Simon Christopher, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A. BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | ||
Former [1998/13] | Roberts, Simon Christopher, et al BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department, 8th Floor, Holborn Centre 120 Holborn London EC1N 2TE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96917573.6 | 07.06.1996 | [1998/13] | WO1996GB01376 | Priority number, date | GB19950011515 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: GB 9511515 | EP19950305060 | 20.07.1995 Original published format: EP 95305060 | GB19960008421 | 24.04.1996 Original published format: GB 9608421 | [1998/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9641405 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0830721 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0830721 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/25, G02F2/00 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
G02F2/004 (EP,US);
H01S5/50 (EP,US);
H01S5/5018 (EP,US);
H01S5/5054 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/13] | H01S3/25 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1998/13] | Title | German: | OPTISCHER VERSTÄRKER | [1998/13] | English: | OPTICAL AMPLIFIER | [1998/13] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR OPTIQUE | [1998/13] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/13] | 02.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 26.08.1998 | [2002/27] | Cited in | International search | [PX] - MARCENAC D D ET AL, "BANDWIDTH ENHANCEMENT OF WAVELENGTH CONVERSION VIA CROSS-GAIN MODULATION BY SEMICONDUCTOR OPTICAL AMPLIFIER CASCADE", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (19950817), vol. 31, no. 17, page 1442/1443, XP000528968 [PX] 1-33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19951014 | [DX] - D.A.O.DAVIES, "Small-signal analysis of wavelength conversion in semiconductor laser amplifiers via gain saturation", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, NEW YORK US, (199506), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 617 - 619, XP002013675 [DX] 1-33 * the whole document * | [DA] - K.E.STUBKJAER ET AL., "Optical wavelength converters", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION, FIRENZE,SEPTEMBER 25-29, 1993,, pages 635 - 641, XP002013676 [DA] 1-33 * page 637, line 12 - line 34; figure 6 * | [DA] - J.M.WIESENFELD ET AL., "Bit error rate performance for wavelength conversion at 20 Gbit/s", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, STEVENAGE GB, (19940428), vol. 30, no. 9, pages 720 - 721, XP002013677 [DA] 1-33 * the whole document * | [A] - MIKKELSEN B ET AL, "20 GBIT/S POLARISATION INSENTIVE WAVELENGTH CONVERSION IN SEMICONDUCTOR OPTICAL AMPLIFIERS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION (EC, MONTREUX, SEPT. 12 - 16, 1993, SWISS ELECTROTECHNICAL ASSOCIATION, (19930912), vol. 3, pages 73 - 76, XP000492291 [A] 1-33 * figures 1,2,4 * | [DA] - S.EL YUMIN ET AL., "Taper-shape dependence of tapered-waveguide traveling wave semiconductor laser amolifier (TTW-SLA)", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRONICS, TOKYO JP, (199404), vol. e77, no. 4, pages 624 - 632, XP000460067 [DA] 1 * paragraph [0005]; figure 1 * | [DA] - MEHUYS D ET AL, "11.6 W PEAK POWER, DIFFRACTION-LIMITED DIODE-TO-DIODE OPTICAL AMPLIFIER", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (19930208), vol. 62, no. 6, pages 544 - 546, XP000336659 [DA] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.108905 |