EP0776106 - METHOD FOR SYNCHRONIZING SPREADING CODE AND DEVICE FOR SYNCHRONIZING SPREADING CODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states NTT MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK INC. 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAWAHASHI, Mamoru 1-59-17, Tomiokanishi, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236 / JP | 02 /
HIGASHI, Akihiro 2-1-3-3-301, Hayashi Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 238-03 / JP | 03 /
HIGUCHI, Kenichi 3-11-11, Take Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 238-03 / JP | [1997/22] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96917651.0 | 12.06.1996 | [1997/22] | WO1996JP01589 | Priority number, date | JP19950146190 | 13.06.1995 Original published format: JP 14619095 | [1997/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9642147 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/56] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0776106 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0776106 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04J13/04, H04J11/00, H04L7/00, H04B1/707 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
H04B1/70775 (EP,US);
H04B1/7075 (EP,US);
H04B1/70755 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70701 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/22] | H04J13/04, H04J11/00, H04L7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SYNCHRONISIERUNG EINES SPREIZCODES | [1997/22] | English: | METHOD FOR SYNCHRONIZING SPREADING CODE AND DEVICE FOR SYNCHRONIZING SPREADING CODE | [1997/22] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SYNCHRONISATION D'UN CODE D'ETALEMENT D'UN SPECTRE | [1997/22] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.1997 | Translation filed | 26.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.1997 | Search fee paid | 26.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 10.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03078321.1 / EP1404032 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPH03192837 (NEC CORP, et al); | [Y]JPH08102698 (CLARION CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0832548 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0690222 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [YE]JPH08223135 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JPH0514312 (FUJITSU LTD) |