EP0840834 - APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR DRILLING AND COMPLETING MULTIPLE WELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARATHON OIL COMPANY 539 South Main Street Findlay, OH 45840 / US | [1998/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLINS, Gary, J. 2215 Landscape Way Richmond, TX 77469 / US | [1998/20] | Representative(s) | Boden, Keith McMurray, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Boden, Keith McMurray, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1998/20] | Purvis, William Michael Cameron, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96917909.2 | 03.06.1996 | [1998/20] | WO1996US08321 | Priority number, date | US19950508635 | 26.07.1995 Original published format: US 508635 | [1998/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9705360 | Date: | 13.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0840834 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0840834 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.02.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E21B7/08, E21B7/12, E21B17/00 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
E21B23/006 (EP,US);
E21B23/12 (EP,US);
E21B33/03 (EP,US);
E21B33/047 (EP,US);
E21B43/14 (EP,US);
E21B43/305 (EP,US);
E21B7/043 (EP,US);
E21B7/061 (EP,US);
E21B7/068 (EP,US);
E21B43/017 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/20] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BOHREN UND KOMPLETIEREN MEHRERER BOHRUNGEN | [1998/20] | English: | APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR DRILLING AND COMPLETING MULTIPLE WELLS | [1998/20] | French: | APPAREILLAGE DE FORAGE ET DE REALISATION DE PLUSIEURS PUITS ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT | [1998/20] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 19.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/20] | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11] | Request for further processing for: | 05.11.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.11.2003 | Decision despatched | 19.11.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 19.11.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.12.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.03.2005 | BE | 23.03.2005 | CH | 23.03.2005 | ES | 23.03.2005 | FI | 23.03.2005 | FR | 23.03.2005 | IT | 23.03.2005 | LI | 23.03.2005 | LU | 03.06.2005 | DK | 23.06.2005 | GR | 23.06.2005 | SE | 23.06.2005 | DE | 24.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
ES | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
IT | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LU | 03.06.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
SE | 23.06.2005 | ||
DE | 24.06.2005 | ||
FR | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2008/06] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
ES | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
IT | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LU | 03.06.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
SE | 23.06.2005 | ||
DE | 24.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
ES | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LU | 03.06.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
DE | 24.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/16] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
ES | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
DE | 24.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
DE | 24.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/18] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
DE | 24.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 23.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US5330007 (COLLINS GARY J [US], et al) [DX] 1-7,18,19,22-28,33,34,39 * column W *; | [PXA]US5462120 (GONDOUIN MICHEL [US]) [PX] 1-3,5,6,18,23,25-28,33,34 * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 44 * * column 8, line 45 - column 9, line 66 * [PA] 40-63; | [E]US5560435 (SHARP ALLAN C [GB]) [E] 1,3-7,25 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 11 ** column 5, line 54 - line 67 * | International search | [A]US1900163 (DREXLER DANA, et al); | [A]US4396075 (WOOD EDWARD T [US], et al); | [A]US4415205 (REHM WILLIAM A [US], et al); | [X]US4573541 (JOSSE JEAN-JACQUES [FR], et al) | by applicant | US5330007 | US19930080042 | US19930170557 |