EP0786024 - PULSED VOLTAGE SURGE RESISTANT MAGNET WIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHELPS DODGE INDUSTRIES, Inc. One Technology Centre, 2131 S. Coliseum Boulevard Fort Wayne, Indiana / US | [1999/04] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states Yin, Weijun 8204 Fieldcrest Court Fort Wayne, IN 46825 / US | ||
For all designated states Barta, Donald, J. 118 Willow Run Drive Monroeville, IN 46773 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yin, Weijun 8204 Fieldcrest Court Fort Wayne, IN 46825 / US | 02 /
Barta, Donald J. 118 Willow Run Drive Monroeville, IN 46773 / US | [1999/04] |
Former [1997/31] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings, Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 96918060.3 | 05.06.1996 | [1997/31] | WO1996US08778 | Priority number, date | US19950480460 | 08.06.1995 Original published format: US 480460 | US19950482214 | 08.06.1995 Original published format: US 482214 | [1997/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9641909 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/56] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786024 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0786024 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D02G3/00, H02K3/34, H01B3/30, H01F5/06 | [1997/46] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [1997/31] | D02G3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/31] | Title | German: | GEGEN PULSIERENDE ÜBERSPANNUNG WIDERSTANDSFÄHIGER DRAHT | [1997/31] | English: | PULSED VOLTAGE SURGE RESISTANT MAGNET WIRE | [1997/31] | French: | FIL MAGNETIQUE RESISTANT AUX ONDES DE TENSION PULSEES | [1997/31] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.1997 | Search fee paid | 09.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/31] | 12.09.1998 | Observations by third parties | 18.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.09.2002
15.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Morf, Jan Stefan Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | 02
27.09.2002
24.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE Nexans 16, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Feray, Valérie Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.09.2002
15.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH & Co.KG Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Morf, Jan Stefan Abitz und Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 D-81628 München / DE | ||
02
27.09.2002
24.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE Nexans 16, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Feray, Valérie Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, Avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony Cedex / FR | |||
Former [2006/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.09.2002
15.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH & Co.KG Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Morf, Jan Stefan Abitz und Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 D-81628 München / DE | ||
02
27.09.2002
24.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE Nexans 16, rue Monceau 75008 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Feray, Valérie Feray Lenne Conseil 39/41, avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony / FR | |||
Former [2006/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.09.2002
15.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH & Co.KG Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Freiherr von Wittgenstein, Arved, Dr. Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | ||
02
27.09.2002
24.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE Nexans 16, rue Monceau 75008 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Feray, Valérie Feray Lenne Conseil 39/41, avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony / FR | |||
Former [2005/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.09.2002
15.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH & Co.KG Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Freiherr von Wittgenstein, Arved, Dr. Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | ||
02
27.09.2002
24.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE Nexans 16, rue Monceau 75008 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Feray, Valérie COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2002/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.09.2002
15.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH & Co.KG Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Freiherr von Wittgenstein, Arved, Dr. Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | ||
02
27.09.2002
24.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE Nexans 16, rue Monceau 75008 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Feray, Valérie (FR) Cabinet Feray-Lenne 44/52, rue de la Justice F-75020 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2002/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.09.2002
15.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH & Co.KG Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Freiherr von Wittgenstein, Arved, Dr. Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | 07.11.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.05.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.05.2003 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2003 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 06.07.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.07.2006 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/50] | 26.07.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.05.1997 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   09.05.1997 | 09.05.1997 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   09.05.1997 | 09.05.1997 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   09.05.1997 | 09.05.1997 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.05.1997 | 09.05.1997 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   09.05.1997 | 09.05.1997 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   09.05.1997 | 09.05.1997 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   09.05.1997 | 09.05.1997 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.05.1997 | 09.05.1997 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.05.1997 | 09.05.1997 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   09.05.1997 | 09.05.1997 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.05.1997 | 09.05.1997 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   09.05.1997 | 09.05.1997 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   09.05.1997 | 09.05.1997 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   09.05.1997 | 09.05.1997 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   09.05.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.01.2002 | CH | 02.01.2002 | FI | 02.01.2002 | LI | 02.01.2002 | NL | 02.01.2002 | DK | 02.04.2002 | PT | 02.04.2002 | SE | 02.04.2002 | IE | 05.06.2002 | [2003/46] |
Former [2003/29] | BE | 02.01.2002 | |
CH | 02.01.2002 | ||
FI | 02.01.2002 | ||
LI | 02.01.2002 | ||
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
IE | 05.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 02.01.2002 | |
CH | 02.01.2002 | ||
FI | 02.01.2002 | ||
LI | 02.01.2002 | ||
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 02.01.2002 | |
FI | 02.01.2002 | ||
LI | 02.01.2002 | ||
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 02.01.2002 | |
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | NL | 02.01.2002 | |
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 02.04.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5457625 ; | [YA]GB1372476 (TREFIMETAUX G P) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 91 - page 2, line 6; figure 1; claims 1,2 * [A] 8,9; | [YA]US4493873 (KEANE JOHN J [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 14 * * column 4, line 35 - line 65; claims 1,2 * [A] 2-5,8-15,18-25,28-35,38-43 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19790705), vol. 003, no. 078, Database accession no. (E - 121), & JP54057625 A 19790509 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US2935427 (RALPH HALL, et al); | [Y]US4716079 (SANO FUMIKAZU [JP], et al) | other | US3577346 | US4385136 | US4546041 | US4760296 |