EP0830277 - CHILDREN'S STAKE WAGON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RADIO FLYER INC. 6515 West Grand Avenue Chicago, IL 60635 / US | [1998/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PASIN, Antonio, James 1355 West Elmdale Chicago, IL 60660 / US | 02 /
LUCEY, Joseph, Gerald 4211 Pebble Beach Court Franklin, WI 53132 / US | 03 /
WEBER, Jerry, Alan 1164 Hwy 67 Sabula, IA 52070 / US | [1998/13] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/13] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96918334.2 | 06.06.1996 | [1998/13] | WO1996US09515 | Priority number, date | US19950489056 | 09.06.1995 Original published format: US 489056 | US19960635770 | 22.04.1996 Original published format: US 635770 | [1998/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9641741 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/56] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0830277 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62B3/02, B62B3/00, B62B5/06 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
B62B3/02 (EP,US);
B62B3/007 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/13] | B62B3/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1998/39] |
Former [1998/13] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KINDERLEITERWAGEN | [1998/13] | English: | CHILDREN'S STAKE WAGON | [1998/13] | French: | CHARIOT D'ENFANT A RIDELLES | [1998/13] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 05.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/13] | 10.01.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, MC, PT, SE | 27.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/28] | 04.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.02.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.1998 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US2676054 (PASIN MARIO A); | [Y]US5360222 (BRO JAY M [US], et al); | [Y]US1535128 (NUGENT MILNER); | [Y]US1632384 (SINCLAIR SHOWERS ERNEST); | [A]US1707730 (KENNEDY THOMAS D); | [A]US1845092 (EWALD MEININGHAUS); | [A]US3116935 (MITCHIN MICHAEL P, et al); | [A]US5071185 (SCHIELE JIM D [US]); | [A]US5529323 (VOM BRAUCKE HANS [DE], et al) | by applicant | US4930831 | US19950489056 |