EP0795070 - SOUNDPROOF WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bergiadis, Bill 3420 Malt Avenue Commerce, CA 90040 / US | [1997/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/38] | Representative(s) | Hallam, Arnold Vincent, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Hallam, Arnold Vincent, et al Marks & Clerk 144 New Walk Leicester LE1 7JA / GB | ||
Former [1997/38] | Hallam, Arnold Vincent, et al E.N. LEWIS & TAYLOR 5 The Quadrant Coventry, CV1 2EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96918432.4 | 07.06.1996 | [1997/38] | WO1996US09920 | Priority number, date | US19950473349 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 473349 | [1997/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9641061 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0795070 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E04H17/00, E04B1/82, E04B2/74, E04B1/86, E04B1/84 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
E04B2/7411 (EP,US);
E01F8/0029 (EP,US);
E04B1/82 (EP,US);
E04B2001/8263 (EP,US);
E04B2001/8471 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/38] | E04H17/00, E04B1/82 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT [1997/38] | Title | German: | SCHALLSCHLUCKWAND | [1997/38] | English: | SOUNDPROOF WALL | [1997/38] | French: | PAROI D'INSONORISATION | [1997/38] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.1997 | Search fee paid | 16.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 26.08.1997 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 25.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 30.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/28] | 21.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.05.1997 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1997 | 14.05.1997 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1997 | 14.05.1997 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1997 | 14.05.1997 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1997 | 14.05.1997 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1997 | 14.05.1997 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1997 | 14.05.1997 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1997 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.06.1997 | M01   Fee paid on   20.06.1997 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.1998 | 30.06.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0322381 (T C R S R L [IT]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [YA]DE1559560 (HOLTSLAG GEB VRIEZEN) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [YA]GB2067619 (MARLEY TRIDENT LTD) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [Y]DE3149752 (REIFF ALBERT KG [DE]) [Y] 2 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9016820U (BARTL LECHNER OGH) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5297369 (DICKINSON SYDNEY L [CA]) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [X]FR2226909 (MATERIAUX NOUVEAUX [FR]) [X] 4 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3519153 (GAIL AG [DE], et al) [X] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2177393 (PARKINSON JOHN S) [A] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]CH201550 (ANONIMA FABBRICHE FIAMMIFERI E [IT]) [A] 4 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0507713 (CLESTRA HAUSERMAN SA [FR]) [X] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2209377 (V. LEITGEB OGH) [A] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1314564 (P. H. ALEXANDRE) [A] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3413878 (MECSEKI SZENBANYAK [HU]) [A] 3,4 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5297369 (DICKINSON SYDNEY L [CA]); | [Y]US2177393 (PARKINSON JOHN S); | [Y]US4838524 (MCKEOWN PATRICK D [US], et al) |