EP0846093 - SYNTHESIS OF GLYCOL ETHERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.03.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 19.04.2000 [2000/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP Chemicals Limited Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus London EC2M 7BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states BP Chemicals Limited Britannic House 1 Finsbury Circus London EC2M 7BA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATKINS, Martin, Philip 29 Chaucer Road Ashford Middlesex TW15 2QU / GB | 02 /
DEPEGE, Corinne, Laurence 5B, rue d'Allagnat F-63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | 03 /
FORANO, Claude, René, Marcel Rue Barry-Gergovie F-63670 La Roche Blanche / FR | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | Krishnan, Suryanarayana Kalyana, et al c/o The British Petroleum Company plc Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | Krishnan, Suryanarayana Kalyana, et al c/o The British Petroleum Company plc Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 96918757.4 | 17.06.1996 | [1998/24] | WO1996GB01462 | Priority number, date | GB19950012727 | 22.06.1995 Original published format: GB 9512727 | [1998/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9700842 | Date: | 09.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0846093 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C41/03, C07C43/13, C07C43/11 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
C07C41/03 (EP,KR);
C07C43/13 (KR);
C07C43/11 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C41/03, C07C43/11 (EP);
C07C41/03, C07C43/13 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/24] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON GLYKOLETHERN | [1998/24] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF GLYCOL ETHERS | [1998/24] | French: | SYNTHESE D'ETHERS DE GLYCOL | [1998/24] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 09.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.10.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/16] | 19.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9211224 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]) [A] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]EP0515636 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]) [DA] 1-15; | [A]EP0529726 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 6 - line 16; example -; claim - *; | [DA]EP0339426 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [DA] 1-15 * example -; claim - * |