EP0830651 - RESERVED CYLINDER FOR SCSI DEVICE WRITE-BACK CACHE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTI Technology Corporation 474 Potrero Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [1998/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HICKSTED, Richard, L. P.O. Box 4041 Incline Village, NV 89450 / US | 02 /
GLASER, Michael Dorfstrasse 62 D-58840 Plettenberg / DE | [1998/13] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96919202.0 | 04.06.1996 | [1998/13] | WO1996US09463 | Priority number, date | US19950464101 | 05.06.1995 Original published format: US 464101 | [1998/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9639653 | Date: | 12.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0830651 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0830651 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/30, G06F11/14 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
G06F11/1441 (EP,US);
G06F12/0804 (EP,US);
G06F12/0866 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/13] | G06F1/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/13] | Title | German: | RESERVIERTER ZYLINDER FÜR EINEN NACHSCHREIB-CACHESPEICHER FÜR SCSI-GERÄT | [1998/13] | English: | RESERVED CYLINDER FOR SCSI DEVICE WRITE-BACK CACHE | [1998/13] | French: | CYLINDRE RESERVE POUR ANTEMEMOIRE DE REECRITURE DE DISPOSITIF A INTERFACE POUR PETITS SYSTEMES INFORMATIQUES | [1998/13] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 05.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/13] | 14.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9215933 (ZITEL CORP [US]) [A] 1,5,10 * page 45, line 19 - page 46, line 16; claim 1 *; | [A]US5339437 (YUEN DESMOND [US]) [A] 1,5,10 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 10 * * column 6, line 16 - column 7, line 18; figures 2A,2B * | International search | [YP]US5519831 (HOLZHAMMER GERALD S [US]); | [Y]US5379435 (HANAOKA MASAAKI [JP]); | [A]US5396637 (HARWELL JOHN C [US], et al); | [A]US5204963 (NOYA ERIC S [US], et al); | [A]US4458307 (MCANLIS JAMES C [GB], et al) |