EP0827608 - PROCESS FOR THE COMPUTER-ASSISTED MEASUREMENT AND TESTING OF ELECTRIC CIRCUITS, ESPECIALLY ELECTRONIC MODULES, AND TESTING STATION FOR IMPLEMENTING THE PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 03.08.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/14] |
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 70546 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IRREGGER, Franz Am Fohlengarten 7A D-85764 Oberschleisseim / DE | 02 /
MEISSNER, Horst Lärchenstrasse 10 D-82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | 03 /
STEPHAN, Harald Margaretenanger 13 D-85716 Unterschleisseim / DE | [1998/46] |
Former [1998/11] | 01 /
IRREGGER, Franz Am Fohlengarten 7A D-85764 Oberschlei heim / DE | ||
02 /
MEISSNER, Horst Lärchenstrasse 10 D-82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | |||
03 /
STEPHAN, Harald Margaretenanger 13 D-85716 Unterschlei heim / DE | Application number, filing date | 96919576.7 | 23.05.1996 | [1998/11] | WO1996DE00906 | Priority number, date | DE19951018928 | 23.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19518928 | [1998/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9637839 | Date: | 28.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0827608 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0827608 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/273, G01R31/28 | [1998/11] | CPC: |
G01R31/2834 (EP,US);
G01R31/31912 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RECHNERGESTÜTZTEN MESSUNG UND PRÜFUNG VON ELEKTRISCHEN SCHALTUNGEN, INSBESONDERE VON ELEKTRONISCHEN BAUGRUPPEN, UND PRÜFPLATZ ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [1998/11] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE COMPUTER-ASSISTED MEASUREMENT AND TESTING OF ELECTRIC CIRCUITS, ESPECIALLY ELECTRONIC MODULES, AND TESTING STATION FOR IMPLEMENTING THE PROCESS | [1998/11] | French: | PROCEDE DE MESURE ET DE VERIFICATION ASSISTE PAR ORDINATEUR DE CIRCUITS ELECTRIQUES, NOTAMMENT DE MODULES ELECTRONIQUES, ET POSTE DE VERIFICATION POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DUDIT PROCEDE | [1998/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 19.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.1999
25.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE Opponent's representative von Bülow, Tam Am Klueshoff 22 24955 Harrislee / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.1999
25.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE Opponent's representative von Bülow, Tam, Dr. Patentanwalt Mailänder Strasse 13 81545 München / DE | 22.09.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.01.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.02.2000 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 18.04.2000 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 14.02.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.02.2001 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2001/38] | 09.04.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 11.11.1998 | SE | 11.11.1998 | PT | 11.02.1999 | ES | 24.05.1999 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/13] | GR | 11.11.1998 | |
SE | 11.11.1998 | ||
PT | 11.02.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GR | 11.11.1998 | |
PT | 11.02.1999 | ||
Former [2001/05] | PT | 11.02.1999 | |
Former [2000/25] | GB | 11.11.1998 | |
PT | 11.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/22] | GB | 11.11.1998 | |
PT | 11.02.1999 | ||
FR | 09.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/03] | GB | 11.11.1998 | |
PT | 11.02.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | PT | 11.02.1999 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0339286 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [Y] 3,4 * abstract *; | [A]EP0397937 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]US4977531 (OGATA TERUAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]DE4100899 (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract ** column 1, line 55 - column 3, line 17; figures 1-3 *; | [XY] - ZIEGLER ET AL., "PROVIDING ADA BASED TEST PROGRAM AND SOFT PANEL INSTRUMENT CONTROLS", AUTOTESTCON '89 CONFERENCE RECORD; IEEE INTERNATIONAL TESTING CONFERENCE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, USA, (19890925), pages 187 - 194, XP000078712 [X] 1,2 * page 189, column L, paragraph 5 - page 191, column L; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3,4 | [A] - NIERMANN, "DIE "WAVES" SCHLAGEN HOCH", ELEKTRONIK, MUNCHEN DE, (19891027), vol. 38, no. 22, pages 132 - 135, XP000070855 [A] 1-4 * page 132; figure 1 * |