EP0829172 - CELLULAR CORDLESS TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM WITH ISDN CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.2000 [2000/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAULI, Burkhard Hubertusstrasse 3 D-46284 Dorsten / DE | 02 /
NEUHAUS, Ralf Laakstrasse 42b D-44534 Lünen / DE | 03 /
IDE, Hans-Dieter Aplerbecker Schulstrasse 24 D-44287 Dortmund / DE | 04 /
FLAKE, Horst Hubertusstrasse 6 D-82041 Oberhaching / DE | 05 /
WEWERS, Otger Brahmsstrasse 13 D-46395 Bocholt / DE | [1998/12] | Application number, filing date | 96919599.9 | 29.05.1996 | [1998/12] | WO1996DE00933 | Priority number, date | DE1995119966 | 31.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19519966 | [1998/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9638990 | Date: | 05.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/53] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0829172 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0829172 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/24, H04Q7/30, H04B7/26, H04J3/06 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0471 (EP,US);
H04B7/269 (EP,US);
H04M1/733 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0457 (EP,US);
H04B7/2693 (EP,US);
H04J3/0638 (EP,US);
H04M2250/08 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/098 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13098 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13106 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13202 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13209 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1322 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1326 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1328 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13282 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13299 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1332 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13322 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1336 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/298 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/12] | Title | German: | ZELLULARES SCHNURLOS-TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT ISDN-ANSCHLUSS | [1998/12] | English: | CELLULAR CORDLESS TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM WITH ISDN CONNECTION | [1998/12] | French: | SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATION CELLULAIRE SANS FIL AVEC RACCORDEMENT RNIS | [1998/12] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 09.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0529359 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,19-21,33-35 * column W * [Y] 2-4,8,14-18; | [A]US5309440 (NAKAMURA HAJIME [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 1 - line 58 *; | [A]US5327433 (HALL CLIFFORD L [US]) [A] 1,7,10,11* column 14, line 45 - column 16, line 9 *; | [A]WO9418764 (AT & T WIRELESS COMMUNICAT [GB], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 6, line 31 - page 9, line 4 *; | [A]EP0624995 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE]) [A] 1,19-21,33-35 * column W *; | [XY]US5388102 (GRIFFITH GARY L [US], et al) [X] 1,33-35 * column W * [Y] 2-4,8,14-18; | [A]US5398249 (CHEN CHI-CHANG [TW], et al) [A] 1,8,14-19 * column 5, line 59 - column 7, line 5 * |