EP0832082 - N-HETEROARYL-PYRIDINESULFONAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS ENDOTHELIN ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2000/35] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states AstraZeneca UK Limited 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | ||
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states ZENECA LIMITED 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRADBURY, Robert, Hugh Mereside, Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 02 /
BUTLIN, Roger, John Mereside, Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 03 /
JAMES, Roger Mereside, Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Bill, Kevin, et al ZENECA Pharmaceuticals Intellectual Property Department Mereside Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | Bill, Kevin, et al ZENECA Pharmaceuticals Intellectual Property Department Mereside Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | Application number, filing date | 96919941.3 | 03.06.1996 | [1998/14] | WO1996GB01295 | Priority number, date | GB19950011507 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: GB 9511507 | GB19950019666 | 27.09.1995 Original published format: GB 9519666 | [1998/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9640681 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0832082 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0832082 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, A61K31/495 | [1998/14] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/14] | Extension states | LT | 07.01.1998 | LV | 07.01.1998 | SI | 07.01.1998 | Title | German: | N-HETEROARYL-PYRIDINSULFONAMIDDERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS ENDOTHELINANTAGONISTEN | [2001/12] | English: | N-HETEROARYL-PYRIDINESULFONAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS ENDOTHELIN ANTAGONISTS | [1998/14] | French: | DERIVES DU N-HETEROARYL-PYRIDINESULFONAMIDE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME ANTAGONISTES DE L'ENDOTHELINE | [2001/12] |
Former [1998/14] | N-HETEROARYL-PYRIDINSULFONAMIDDERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS ENDOTHELINANTAGONISTE | ||
Former [1998/14] | DERIVES DU N-HETEROARYLE-PYRIDINESULFONAMIDE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME ANTAGONISTES DE L'ENDOTHELINE | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 28.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0510526 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] * claim - *; | [XD]EP0640596 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [XD] 1-17 * example 4; claim - *; | [PX]WO9526957 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-17* examples 49-67; claim 1 * |