EP0834741 - COLLOIDAL GOLD IMMUNOASSAY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.11.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SS PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 12-4, Nihonbashi hamacho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states SS Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 12-4, Nihonbashi hamacho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTSUGAI, Takeshi 4-5, Tamatsukuri 3-chome Sawara-shi, Chiba-ken 287 / JP | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96919992.6 | 29.05.1996 | [1998/15] | WO1996JP01446 | Priority number, date | JP19950177977 | 22.06.1995 Original published format: JP 17797795 | [1998/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9701099 | Date: | 09.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0834741 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.01.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/553, G01N33/532, G01N33/58 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
G01N33/585 (EP,US);
G01N33/553 (KR);
G01N33/5306 (EP,US);
G01N33/532 (EP,US);
Y10S435/962 (EP,US);
Y10S436/826 (EP,US);
Y10T436/2525 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/15] | G01N33/553 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/15] | Title | German: | IMMUNOASSAY-VERFAHREN MIT KOLLOIDALEM GOLD | [1998/15] | English: | COLLOIDAL GOLD IMMUNOASSAY METHOD | [1998/15] | French: | DOSAGE IMMUNOLOGIQUE A L'OR COLLOIDAL | [1998/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.1997 | Translation filed | 22.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 22.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 27.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/51] | 27.07.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4820649 (KAWAGUCHI TAKEYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 28-42 * * column 4, lines 10-21 * * column 9, lines 31-47 * * column 13, line 62 - column 14, line 24 *; | [A]EP0428412 (ORTHO DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 3, lines 20-52 * * page 6, lines 31-45 * | International search | [Y]JPH04161853 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA, et al); | [Y]JPH0712807 (NISSUI PHARM CO LTD); | [Y]JPH07151753 (EASTMAN KODAK CO) |