EP0829535 - CELLS PRODUCING RECOMBINANT RETROVIRUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAKUNAGA SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-36, Miyahara 4-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 532 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states WAKUNAGA SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-36, Miyahara 4-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 532 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIMATSU, Tadanori, Wakunaga Seiyaku K. K. 1624, Shimo-kotachi Koda-cho Takata-gun, Hiroshima 739-11 / JP | 02 /
IKENAKA, Kazuhiro 11-8, Aza-Hanabe Makimido Okazaki-shi, Aichi 444 / JP | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Polz, Leo, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Polz, Leo, Dr., et al Hoffmann Eitle Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/12] | Kolb, Helga, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96920024.5 | 31.05.1996 | [1998/12] | WO1996JP01484 | Priority number, date | JP19950136877 | 02.06.1995 Original published format: JP 13687795 | [1998/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9638545 | Date: | 05.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0829535 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/10, C12N7/01, C12N15/37, C12N15/86 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12N2740/13043 (EP,US);
C12N2740/13052 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1998/12] | Title | German: | ZELLEN WELCHE REKOMBINENTEN RETROVIRUS PRODUZIEREN | [1998/12] | English: | CELLS PRODUCING RECOMBINANT RETROVIRUS | [1998/12] | French: | CELLULES GENERATRICES DE RETROVIRUS DE RECOMBINAISON | [1998/12] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.1997 | Translation filed | 02.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 02.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 02.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 30.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/48] | 22.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - HENDRICKSON E. A. ET AL., "The origin of bidirectional DNA replication in polyoma virus.", EMBO JOURNAL, (1987), vol. 6, no. 7, pages 2011 - 2018, XP002098807 [A] 1-6 * figure 1 * | [T] - YOSHIMATSU T. ET AL., "Improvement of retroviral packaging cell lines by introducing the polyomavirus early region.", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (199801), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 161 - 172, XP002098808 [T] 1-6 * column W * | International search | [A]WO9420621 (BRITISH BIO TECHNOLOGY [GB], et al); | [AP]WO9607749 (VIAGENE INC [US]); | [AE]WO9619245 (LOS ANGELES CHILDRENS HOSPITAL [US], et al) | [A] - J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), Vol. 266, No. 19, WANG E.H. et al., "DNA Helicase and Duplex DNA Fragment Unwinding Activities of Polyoma and Simian Virus 40 Large T Antigen Display Similarities and Differences", p. 12668-12675. | [A] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1987), Vol. 84, MURPHY A.J.M. et al., "Cloning Vectors for Expression of cDNA Libraries in Mammalian Cells", p. 8277-8281. | [A] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1987), Vol. 84, KORMAN A.J. et al., "Expression of Human Class II Major Histocompatibility Complex Antigens Using Retrovirus Vectors", p. 2150-2154. |