EP0830565 - DISTANCE MEASURING CONFOCAL MICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.07.2002 [2002/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KERAVISION, INC. 48630 Milmont Drive Fremont California 94530-7353 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states KERAVISION, INC. 48630 Milmont Drive Fremont, California 94530-7353 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUHN, William, P. 2810 W. Daffodil Place Tuscon, AZ 87545 / US | 02 /
BAKER, Philip, C. 32 Camino Del Diablo Orinda, CA 94563 / US | [1998/13] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96920230.8 | 15.05.1996 | [1998/13] | WO1996US06990 | Priority number, date | US19950484204 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 484204 | [1998/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9641123 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0830565 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/02, G01B11/24 | [1998/13] | CPC: |
G01B11/255 (EP,US);
G01B11/026 (EP,US);
G01B2210/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/13] | Title | German: | KONFOKALMIKROSKOP ZUM DISTANZMESSEN | [1998/13] | English: | DISTANCE MEASURING CONFOCAL MICROSCOPE | [1998/13] | French: | MICROSCOPE A FOYER COMMUN A MESURE DE DISTANCE | [1998/13] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.12.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/13] | 21.05.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   08.11.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0142464 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [CH]) [X] 1-5,8-11,14-16 * see introduction ;; page 2, line 22 - page 4, line 4; figure 1 * * page 4, line 15 - page 8, line 27; figure 3 *; | [X]WO8810406 (BATTELLE INSTITUT E V [DE]) [X] 1,6-11,14 * page 3, paragraph 6 - page 5, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 *; | [X] - "Chromatic Focusing Technique", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK, USA, (198505), vol. 27, no. 12, pages 6850 - 6851, XP002010405 [X] 1,5,9-11,15,16 * see the whole article; * |