EP0837761 - AQUEOUS ANTI-MICROBIAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING ORGANOTIN COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FONG, James, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1998/18] | Representative(s) | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Ahner, Francis, et al CABINET REGIMBEAU 26, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96920472.6 | 24.05.1996 | [1998/18] | WO1996US07637 | Priority number, date | US19950494370 | 26.06.1995 Original published format: US 494370 | [1998/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9701423 | Date: | 16.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0837761 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B27K3/50, A01N55/04 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
A01N55/04 (EP);
B27K3/50 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N55/04, A01N2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/18] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE ANTIMIKROBIELLE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, ORGANOZINNVERBINDUNGEN ENTHALTENT | [1998/18] | English: | AQUEOUS ANTI-MICROBIAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING ORGANOTIN COMPOUNDS | [1998/18] | French: | COMPOSITIONS AQUEUSES ANTIMICROBIENNES CONTENANT DES COMPOSES ORGANOSTANNIQUES | [1998/18] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 04.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/36] | 14.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2957785 (L.G.LEATHERLAND ET AL.) [X] 1-11 * column 6; table 1 * * column 8; example I * * column 11; examples VIII,,X *; | [X]GB1122371 (F.J.SAWA) [X] 1-11 * column 1, lines 1-24 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 97 *; | [X]DD235847 ; | [A]EP0072426 (SCHERING AG); | [A]FR2220190 (ALBRIGHT & WILSON) | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 38, Database accession no. 86-245882, XP002013114 & DD235847 A 19860521 (VE KOMB ELASKON) [X] 1 * abstract * |