EP0835449 - METHOD FOR THE SIMULTANEOUS DETECTION OF DIFFERENT ANTIBODIES AND/OR ANTIGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAKO A/S Produktionsvej 42 2600 Glostrup / DK | [1998/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STENDER, Henrik Fasanhaven 5 DK-2820 Gentofte / DK | 02 /
GRAUBALLE, Per, Chr. Pilegaardsvej 16 Bloustroed DK-3450 Alleroed / DK | [1998/16] | Application number, filing date | 96920750.5 | 27.06.1996 | [1998/16] | WO1996DK00288 | Priority number, date | DK19950000753 | 29.06.1995 Original published format: DK 75395 | [1998/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9701758 | Date: | 16.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0835449 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/537 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
G01N33/537 (EP);
G01N2333/4716 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM GLEICHZEITIGEN NACHWEIS VON UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN ANTIKÖRPERN | [1998/16] | English: | METHOD FOR THE SIMULTANEOUS DETECTION OF DIFFERENT ANTIBODIES AND/OR ANTIGENS | [1998/16] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETECTION SIMULTANEE DE DIFFERENTS ANTICORPS ET/OU ANTIGENES | [1998/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 05.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/26] | 03.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]US4283383 (MASSON PIERRE L ET AL) [DX] 1-18 * claim 10 *; | [DX]DE4214589 (IMTEC IMMUNDIAGNOSTIKA GMBH) [DX] 1-18 * claims 5-7 *; | [DX]WO9207267 (UNIV NORTHWESTERN) [DX] 1-18 * claims 4-6,17-19 *; | [X]WO9417410 (IMRE CORP ;BALINT JAMES P (US)) [X] 1-18 * the whole document * |