EP0842182 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF N-PHOSPHONOMETHYGLYCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Limited European Regional Centre Priestley Road Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 7YH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Syngenta Limited European Regional Centre Priestley Road Surrey Research Park Guildford Surrey GU2 7YH / GB | ||
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Syngenta Limited Fernhurst Haslemere, Surrey GU27 3JE / GB | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Syngenta Limited Fernhurst Haselmere, Surrey GU27 3JE / GB | ||
Former [1998/21] | For all designated states ZENECA LIMITED 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HODGKINSON, Ian 1 Bankfield Drive, Holmbridge Huddersfield, Yorkshire HD7 1PH / GB | [1998/21] | Representative(s) | Ricks, Michael James, et al Syngenta Limited Intellectual Property Department Jealott's Hill International Research Centre P.O. Box 3538 Bracknell Berkshire RG 42 6YA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | Ricks, Michael James, et al Intellectual Property Department, ZENECA Agrochemicals, Jealotts Hill Research Station, P.O. Box 3538 Bracknell, Berkshire RG42 6YA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96920995.6 | 27.06.1996 | [1998/21] | WO1996GB01548 | Priority number, date | GB19950015265 | 25.07.1995 Original published format: GB 9515265 | [1998/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9705149 | Date: | 13.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0842182 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0842182 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/38 | [1998/21] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON N-PHOSPHONOMETHYLGLYZIN | [1998/21] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF N-PHOSPHONOMETHYGLYCINE | [1998/21] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE LA N-PHOSPHONOMETHYLGLYCINE | [1998/21] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/21] | 15.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.11.2001 | BE | 14.11.2001 | FI | 14.11.2001 | GR | 14.11.2001 | NL | 14.11.2001 | PT | 14.02.2002 | SE | 14.02.2002 | IE | 27.06.2002 | LU | 27.06.2002 | MC | 27.06.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/29] | AT | 14.11.2001 | |
BE | 14.11.2001 | ||
FI | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
IE | 27.06.2002 | ||
MC | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | AT | 14.11.2001 | |
BE | 14.11.2001 | ||
FI | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
MC | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 14.11.2001 | |
BE | 14.11.2001 | ||
FI | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 14.11.2001 | |
FI | 14.11.2001 | ||
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 14.11.2001 | |
GR | 14.11.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 14.11.2001 | |
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 14.11.2001 | |
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 14.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | ES545456 [ ] (ORGASA); | [A]EP0109314 (STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0115176 (STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0323821 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [DA] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9615135 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-11* see page 6, paragraphs 2 and 3 and example 11 *; | [A] - OTAL OLIVAN J V ET AL, "Procedure for obtaining N-phosphonomethylglycine", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870202), vol. 106, no. 5, Database accession no. 033318, XP002015599 [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - SUBRAMANIAM V ET AL, "Metal complexes of glyphosate", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19881128), vol. 109, no. 22, Database accession no. 196680, XP002015600 [A] 1-11 * abstract * | Examination | - J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM.;88; VOL.36 (6); PP.1326-9, NORTH DAKOTA STATE UNIV.; DEP. CHEM.; FARGO; 58105; ND; USA |