EP0782764 - LOW-PRESSURE MERCURY DISCHARGE LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [1999/40] | For:DE
FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1997/28] | For:DE
FR
GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OOMS, Pieter, Cornelis Mr. F.J. Haarmanweg 25 NL-4538 AN Terneuzen / NL | [1997/28] | Representative(s) | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1997/28] | Evers, Johannes Hubertus Maria INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V, Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 96921016.0 | 11.07.1996 | [1997/28] | WO1996IB00673 | Priority number, date | EP19950202013 | 21.07.1995 Original published format: EP 95202013 | [1997/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9704477 | Date: | 06.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0782764 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0782764 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/24, H01J61/72 | [1997/28] | CPC: |
H01J61/24 (EP,US);
H01J61/36 (EP,US);
H01J61/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/28] | Title | German: | NIEDERDRUCKQUECKSILBERENTLADUNGSLAMPE | [1997/28] | English: | LOW-PRESSURE MERCURY DISCHARGE LAMP | [1997/28] | French: | LAMPE A DECHARGE BASSE PRESSION AU MERCURE | [1997/28] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 01.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4105910 (EVANS GEORGE S); | [A]US5204584 (IKEDA TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) |