EP0835997 - FUEL INJECTION TIMING CONTROL DEVICE FOR AN ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 33-8, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8410 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JIDOSHA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 33-8, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8410 / JP | ||
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JIDOSHA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | ||
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JIDOSHA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOGAI, Kazuhide Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Hano, Christian, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | Hano, Christian, Dipl.-Ing., et al von Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck, Patentanwälte, Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96921092.1 | 26.06.1996 | [1998/16] | WO1996JP01768 | Priority number, date | JP19950166710 | 30.06.1995 Original published format: JP 16671095 | [1998/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9702416 | Date: | 23.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0835997 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0835997 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.01.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F02D1/18, F02D41/40, F02M41/12 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
F02D1/18 (KR);
F02D41/1498 (EP,US);
F02D41/40 (KR);
F02D41/401 (EP,US);
F02D41/408 (EP,US);
F02M41/128 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1998/16] | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZKONTROLLEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN MOTOR | [1998/16] | English: | FUEL INJECTION TIMING CONTROL DEVICE FOR AN ENGINE | [1998/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION DU TEMPS D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR UN MOTEUR | [1998/16] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.1998 | Translation filed | 26.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 26.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 02.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 15.06.2007 | GB | 26.06.2007 | SE | 27.06.2007 | FR | 02.07.2007 | [2008/44] |
Former [2008/28] | DE | 15.06.2007 | |
GB | 26.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | DE | 15.06.2007 | |
GB | 26.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | DE | 15.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4476832 (FUJIMORI KYOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 8 - column 2, line 2 * * column 4, line 37 - line 58 *; | [A]JPS57181941 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830202), vol. 007, no. 025, Database accession no. (M - 190), & JP57181941 A 19821109 (NIPPON DENSO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH0119059B ; | [Y]JPS56136141U ; | [A]JPS54163224 (DIESEL KIKI CO); | [A]JPS6339394U |