EP0835416 - HEAT EXCHANGER WITH IMPROVED CONFIGURATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Level Holding B.V. Panterlaan 20 5691 GD Son / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states LEVEL ENERGIETECHNIEK B.V. Panterlaan 20 5691 GD Son / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VELTKAMP, Wessel, Bart Panterlaan 20 NL-5691 GD Son / NL | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Eveleens Maarse, Pieter, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Eveleens Maarse, Pieter, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1998/16] | Eveleens Maarse, Pieter, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 96921155.6 | 27.06.1996 | [1998/16] | WO1996NL00263 | Priority number, date | NL19951000706 | 30.06.1995 Original published format: NL 1000706 | [1998/16] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9702461 | Date: | 23.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0835416 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0835416 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F28F3/08 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
F28D9/0037 (EP);
F28D21/0001 (EP);
F28F2250/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/16] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER WÄRMETAUSCHER | [1998/16] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER WITH IMPROVED CONFIGURATION | [1998/16] | French: | ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE A CONFIGURATION AMELIOREE | [1998/16] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.1997 | Translation filed | 22.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 26.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CH212268 (JENDRASSIK GEORG DIPL ING [HU]) [A] 1-23 * page 3, column L, line 28 - page 5, column L, line 31; figures 1-9 *; | [A]DE2226056 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1-23* page 5, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2315674 (FERODO SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-23 * page 2, line 27 - page 6, line 13; figures 1-6 *; | [X]DE3330254 (FARKAS GYOERGY DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0208042 (HAMON IND [FR]) [X] 1-14 * column 3, line 32 - column 5, line 12 * * column 7, line 47 - column 8, line 21; figures 2,11 * [A] 15-23; | [A]EP0548604 (BALCKE DUERR AG [DE]) [A] 1-23 * column 4, line 6 - column 7, line 26; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE4301296 (BREITLING PHILIPP DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document * |