EP0882377 - ADAPTIVE CHANNEL ALLOCATION IN A FREQUENCY DIVISION MULTIPLEXED SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1998/50] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRODIGH, Carl, Magnus Risvägen 1F SE-192 73 Sollentuna / SE | 02 /
GUDMUNDSON, Perols, Leif, Mikael Ragvägen 3 SE-192 69 Sollentuna / SE | [2005/02] |
Former [1998/50] | 01 /
FRODIGH, Carl, Magnus Langelandsgatan 43, 1 tr S-164 43 Kista / SE | ||
02 /
GUDMUNDSON, Perols, Leif, Mikael Koldinggatan 4, 2 tr S-164 46 Kista / SE | Representative(s) | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit Radio Networks Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit Radio Networks 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2003/50] | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan, et al Ericsson AB, Patent Unit Radio Networks 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/41] | Lövgren, Tage, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB, Patent Support, Legal Matters Radio Systems and Technology 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/16] | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB, Patent Unit Radio Access 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/12] | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1998/50] | Norin, Klas, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 96921200.0 | 20.06.1996 | [1998/50] | WO1996SE00814 | Priority number, date | US19950493489 | 22.06.1995 Original published format: US 493489 | [1998/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9701256 | Date: | 09.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0882377 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0882377 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04L5/06 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
H04W16/10 (EP,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04L5/0032 (EP,US);
H04L5/0046 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W72/0453 (EP,US);
H04W72/541 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, SE [1998/50] | Title | German: | ADAPTIVE KANALZUTEILUNG IN EINEM FREQUENZMULTIPLEXSYSTEM | [2004/50] | English: | ADAPTIVE CHANNEL ALLOCATION IN A FREQUENCY DIVISION MULTIPLEXED SYSTEM | [1998/50] | French: | AFFECTATION DYNAMIQUE DE VOIES DANS UN SYSTEME DE MULTIPLEXAGE PAR REPARTITION EN FREQUENCE | [1998/50] |
Former [1998/50] | ADOPTIVE KANALZUTEILUNG IN EINEM FREQUENZMULTIPLEXSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 29.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/50] | 04.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0490509 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1-8,14-22* the whole document *; | [A]US5295138 (GREENBERG A FREDERICK [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * claim - *; | [A]EP0637181 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-5,14-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US5400322 (HUNT RONALD R [US], et al) [A] 1-5,8-10,14-18,21-23 * column 1, line 31 - column 3, line 63 *; | [X]WO9510144 (TELIA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-10,14-23 * the whole document *; | [A] - CHAN C -K ET AL, "Efficient frequency assignment scheme for intermodulation distortion reduction in fibre-optic microcellular systems", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, 27 OCT. 1994, UK, ISSN 0013-5194, vol. 30, no. 22, pages 1831 - 1832, XP000490811 [A] 1-7,14-18,20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19941237 |