EP0774129 - APPARATUS FOR COUPLING A MULTIPLE EMITTER LASER DIODE TO A MULTIMODE OPTICAL FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPECTRA-PHYSICS LASERS, INC. 1330 Terra Bella Avenue, Mountain View California 94043 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states SPECTRA-PHYSICS LASERS, INC. 1330 Terra Bella Avenue Mountain View, California 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEAD, David, F. 207 Thomas Drive Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | 02 /
BAER, Thomas, M. 537 Drucilla Drive Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | [1997/21] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96921231.5 | 28.05.1996 | [1997/21] | WO1996US07895 | Priority number, date | US19950457466 | 01.06.1995 Original published format: US 457466 | [1997/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9638749 | Date: | 05.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0774129 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0774129 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42 | [1997/21] | CPC: |
G02B6/4206 (EP,US);
G02B6/425 (EP,US);
H01S3/0941 (EP,US);
H01S3/094053 (EP,US);
H01S5/4025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1997/21] | Title | German: | APPARAT ZUR KOPPLUNG EINER VIELFACHEMITTIERENDER LASERDIODE MIT EINER OPTISCHEN MULTIMODEFASER | [1997/21] | English: | APPARATUS FOR COUPLING A MULTIPLE EMITTER LASER DIODE TO A MULTIMODE OPTICAL FIBER | [1997/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE COUPLER UNE DIODE LASER EMETTRICE MULTIPLE A UNE FIBRE OPTIQUE MULTIMODE | [1997/21] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/21] | 29.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0486175 (SPECTRA PHYSICS LASER DIODE SY [US]) [Y] 1,6,9,14 * column W *; | [X]US5268978 (PO HONG [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-14 * column 3; figures 1-7 *; | [XY] - L.A.ZENTENO, "DESIGN OF A DEVICE FOR PUMPING A DOUBLE-CLAD FIBER LASER WITH A LASER-DIODE BAR", APPLIED OPTICS, NEW YORK US, (19941101), vol. 33, no. 31, pages 7282 - 7287, XP002014170 [X] 1-5,7,9-13,15 * page 7283 - page 7284; figures 1-3 * [Y] 1,6,9,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.33.007282 | [X] - G.NAKAGAWA ET AL., "HIGHLY EFFICIENT COUPLING BETWEEN LD ARRAY AND OPTICAL FIBER ARRAY USING Si MICROLENS ARRAY", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, NEW YORK US, (199309), vol. 5, no. 9, pages 1056 - 1058, XP002014171 [X] 1,9 * the whole document * |