EP0832395 - SELECTIVELY ACTUATABLE LIGHTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIC CORPORATION 500 Bic Drive Milford Connecticut 06460 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states BIC CORPORATION 500 Bic Drive Milford Connecticut 06460 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCDONOUGH, James, M. 46 Crabappel Lane Guilford, CT 06437 / US | 02 /
DOUCET, Michel Bains-sur-Oust F-35600 Redon / FR | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Shanks, Andrew Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | Shanks, Andrew Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96921248.9 | 03.06.1996 | [1998/14] | WO1996US08326 | Priority number, date | US19950462988 | 05.06.1995 Original published format: US 462988 | [1998/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9639597 | Date: | 12.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0832395 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0832395 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F23Q2/16 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
F23Q2/164 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/14] | Title | German: | SELEKTIV BETÄTIGBARES FEUERZEUG | [1998/14] | English: | SELECTIVELY ACTUATABLE LIGHTER | [1998/14] | French: | BRIQUET A ACTIONNEMENT SELECTIF | [1998/14] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 04.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 02.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2648545 (LAFOREST SA [ES]) [X] 1-3,6,7* the whole document *; | [DX]WO9301447 (BIC CORP [US]) [DX] 1-20 * the whole document * | International search | [X]FR2307224 (STAAR DEV CO SA [BE]); | [X]US4190034 (WONISCH FRANZ [DE]); | [X]JPH0618030 (YUUKA SANGYO KK) |