EP0832520 - DEDICATED ALU ARCHITECTURE FOR 10-BIT REED-SOLOMON ERROR CORRECTION MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUANTUM CORPORATION 501 Sycamore Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2001/34] |
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states QUANTUM CORPORATION 500 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas California 95035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREDRICKSON, Lisa 313 Topa Topa Drive Ojai, CA 93023 / US | 02 /
OU, Michael 35343 Rutland Court Newark, CA 94560 / US | [1998/17] |
Former [1998/14] | 01 /
FREDRICKSON, Lisa 313 Topa Topa Drive Ojai, CA 93023 / US | ||
02 /
OU, Michael Apartment E99, 200 E. Dana Street Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [1998/22] |
Former [1998/14] | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson 1 St. Mary's Court St Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96921526.8 | 10.06.1996 | [1998/14] | WO1996US10074 | Priority number, date | US19950490345 | 14.06.1995 Original published format: US 490345 | [1998/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9700559 | Date: | 03.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0832520 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.01.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/00, G11C29/00, G06F7/72 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
G06F11/1008 (EP,US);
H03M13/00 (KR);
G11B20/1833 (EP,US);
H03M13/15 (EP,US);
G06F11/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/14] | H03M13/00, G11C29/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/14] | Title | German: | SPEZIELL ZUGEORDNETE ALV-ARCHITEKTUR FÜR 10 BIT REED-SOLOMON-FEHLERKORREKTURMODELL | [1998/14] | English: | DEDICATED ALU ARCHITECTURE FOR 10-BIT REED-SOLOMON ERROR CORRECTION MODULE | [1998/14] | French: | ARCHITECTURE UAL SPECIALISEE POUR MODULE DE CORRECTION D'ERREUR DE TYPE REED-SOLOMON A 10 BITS | [1998/14] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 19.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/33] | 18.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5227992 (LEE MAN-YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 3-6,11-13,19 * abstract *; | [A] - S. LIN AND D.J. COSTELLO, Error Control, US, PRENTICE HALL, (1987), XP002155124 [A] 4,12 * page 562 * | International search | [Y]US4730321 (MACHADO MICHAEL G [US]); | [Y]US4856003 (WENG LIH-JYH [US]); | [A]US5241546 (PETERSON BRUCE R [US], et al); | [A]US4364081 (HASHIMOTO YOSHITAKA, et al); | [A]US4413339 (RIGGLE CHARLES M [US], et al) | [A] - IEEE, (0-7803-0593-0) 1992, FETTWEIS et al., "A Combined Reed-Solomon Encoder and Syndrome Generator with Small Hardware Complexity", pages 1871-1874. |