EP0837677 - BROMINATED HEXAHYDROXYBIPHENYL DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL 308 Bynum Hall, Campus Box 4105 Chapel Hill, NC 27599-4105 / US | For all designated states Panacos Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 209 Perry Parkway Gaithersburg, MD 20877 / US | [2006/13] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL CB No. 4105, 308 Bynum Hall Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27599-4105 / US | ||
For all designated states Panacos Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 209 Perry Parkway Gaithersburg, MD 20877 / US | |||
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL CB No. 4105, 308 Bynum Hall Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27599-4105 / US | ||
For all designated states V.I. Technologies, Inc. 134 Coolidge Avenue Watertown, MA 02472 / US | |||
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL CB No. 4105, 308 Bynum Hall Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27599-4105 / US | ||
For all designated states BIOTECH RESEARCH LABORATORIES 3 Taft Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Kuo-Hsiung 1426 Gray Bluff Trail Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | 02 /
KASHIWADA, Yoshiki 5-14-31, Kamishin'ei-cho Niigata 950-21 / JP | 03 /
XIE, Lan 603-A Hibbard Drive Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27514 / US | 04 /
COSENTINO, Louis, Mark 6648 Green Ash Drive Springfield, VA 22152 / US | 05 /
MANAK, Mark 200 Stanley Place Laurel, MD 20707 / US | 06 /
XIE, Jing-Xi Institute of Materia Medica Chinese Academy of Med. Science 1 Xian Nong Tan Street Beeijing 100050 / CN | 07 /
CHENG, Yung-Chi 961 Baldwin Road Woodbridge, CT 06525 / US | 08 /
KILKUSKIE, Robert, E. 40 Ireta Road Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | [1998/48] |
Former [1998/18] | 01 /
LEE, Kuo-Hsiung 1426 Gray Bluff Trail Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | ||
02 /
KASHIWADA, Yoshiki 5-14-31, Kamishin'ei-cho Niigata 950-21 / JP | |||
03 /
XIE, Lan 201 Culbreth Park Drive Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | |||
04 /
COSENTINO, Louis, Mark 6648 Green Ash Drive Springfield, VA 22152 / US | |||
05 /
MANAK, Mark 200 Stanley Place Laurel, MD 20707 / US | |||
06 /
XIE, Jing-Xi Institute of Materia Medica Chinese Academy of Med. Science 1 Xian Nong Tan Street Beeijing 100050 / CN | |||
07 /
CHENG, Yung-Chi 961 Baldwin Road Woodbridge, CT 06525 / US | |||
08 /
KILKUSKIE, Robert, E. 40 Ireta Road Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | Representative(s) | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96921528.4 | 07.06.1996 | [1998/18] | WO1996US10080 | Priority number, date | US19950477939 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 477939 | [1998/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9640111 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0837677 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0837677 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/36, A61K31/40, A61K31/495, C07D317/62, C07D317/64, C07D317/66, C07D405/14, C07D317/68 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
C07D317/68 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/18] | A61K31/36, A61K31/40, A61K31/495, C07D317/62, C07D317/64, C07D317/66, C07D405/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/18] | Title | German: | BROMIERTE HEXAHYDROXYBIPHENYLDERIVATE | [1998/18] | English: | BROMINATED HEXAHYDROXYBIPHENYL DERIVATIVES | [1998/18] | French: | DERIVES D'HEXAHYDROXYBIPHENYLE BROMES | [1998/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 18.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.12.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX] - LAN XIE ET AL., "Anti-AIDS (Acquired Immune Deficiency Syndrome) Agents. 17. New Brominated Hexahydroxybiphenyl Derivatives as Potent Anti-HIV Agents", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, (19950804), vol. 38, no. 16, pages 3003 - 3008, XP002118318 [PX] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00016a002 | [A] - KIRK R. GUSTAFSON ET AL., "The Peltatols, Novel HIV-Inhibitory Catechol Derivatives from Pothomorphe peltata", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, EASTON US, (19920508), vol. 57, no. 10, pages 2809 - 2811, XP002118319 [A] 1,5 * page 2809, column 1, line 32 - page 2810, column 1, line 20 * * page 2811, column 1, line 14 - line 25 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00036a010 | International search | [X] - CHEM. ABSTR., Vol. 108, 1988, page 664, Abstract No. 204530f, MINGGUANG et al., "Synthesis and Stability of [3-H]Biphenyl Diester"; & YUANZINENG KEXUE JISHU, 1987, 21(2), 212-15, (Ch). |