EP0778768 - FORMULATIONS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING PROLONGED LOCAL ANESTHESIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Euroceltique S.A. 122 Boulevard de la Petrusse L-2330 Luxembourg / LU | [1997/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHASIN, Mark 3 Wayne Court Manalapan, NJ 07726 / US | 02 /
GOLDENHEIM, Paul 4 Bald Hill Place Wilton, CT 06897 / US | 03 /
SACKLER, Richard 25 Windrose Way Greenwich, CT 06830 / US | 04 /
TIGNER, Joseph 1 Santa Lane New Milford, CT 06776 / US | 05 /
BURCH, Ronald Martin 12A Powder Horn Hill Road Wilton, CT 06897 / US | [1997/25] | Representative(s) | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al Marks & Clerk 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | ||
Former [2004/01] | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al Marks & Clerk, 66-68 Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 1LA / GB | ||
Former [1997/25] | Ruffles, Graham Keith MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96921643.1 | 07.06.1996 | [1997/25] | WO1996US10439 | Priority number, date | US19950000105P | 09.06.1995 Original published format: US 105 P | [2000/29] |
Former [1997/25] | US19950000105 | 09.06.1995 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9641616 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/56] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0778768 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0778768 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K31/715, A61K31/56, A61K31/505, A61K31/24, A61K31/19, A61K9/16, A61K47/02, A61K47/36, A61P29/00 | [2003/14] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [2000/40] | A61K9/14, A61K31/715, A61K31/56, A61K31/505, A61K31/24, A61K31/19, A61K9/16, A61K47/02, A61K47/36 | ||
Former IPC [1997/25] | A61K9/14, A61K31/715, A61K31/56, A61K31/505, A61K31/24, A61K31/19 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/25] | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE VERLÄNGERTE LOKALANÄSTHESIE | [1997/25] | English: | FORMULATIONS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING PROLONGED LOCAL ANESTHESIA | [1997/25] | French: | PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS D'ANESTHESIE LOCALE PROLONGEE | [1997/25] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.1997 | Search fee paid | 17.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/25] | 19.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.05.2004 | BE | 26.05.2004 | CH | 26.05.2004 | FI | 26.05.2004 | LI | 26.05.2004 | LU | 07.06.2004 | IE | 08.06.2004 | MC | 30.06.2004 | DK | 26.08.2004 | GR | 26.08.2004 | SE | 26.08.2004 | ES | 06.09.2004 | PT | 26.10.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/24] | AT | 26.05.2004 | |
BE | 26.05.2004 | ||
CH | 26.05.2004 | ||
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LU | 07.06.2004 | ||
IE | 08.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 26.05.2004 | |
BE | 26.05.2004 | ||
CH | 26.05.2004 | ||
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LU | 07.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 26.05.2004 | |
BE | 26.05.2004 | ||
CH | 26.05.2004 | ||
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 26.05.2004 | |
BE | 26.05.2004 | ||
CH | 26.05.2004 | ||
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 26.05.2004 | |
CH | 26.05.2004 | ||
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 26.05.2004 | |
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 26.05.2004 | |
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
ES | 06.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 26.05.2004 | |
LI | 26.05.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 26.05.2004 | |
LI | 26.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN1091041 ; | [X]US4331728 (THEEUWES FELIX) [X] 1,5,7,8,11,16,17* column 14; example 3 *; | [X]FR2592791 (IRE CELLTARG SA [BE]) [X] 1,7,8,14-17 * page 5, line 4 - line 9 * * page 6, line 7 - line 8 *; | [DX]WO9405265 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US]) [DX] 1-11,16-20 * page 5, line 32 - page 6, line 20 * * page 24 - page 28 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 15, Database accession no. 1997-154920, XP002144657 & CN1091041 A 19940824 (EUGENICS & GOOD EDUCATION RES CENT) [X] 1,3,6-9,16,17 * abstract * | International search | [Y]WO9405265 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US]) | [Y] - M. WINDHOLZ et al., "The Merck Index", Published 1983, by MERCK & CO., INC., (N.J.), page 37, Abstract No. 225. |