EP0779874 - CONTAINER FOR BULK GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/26] | CONTAINER MEANT FOR BULK GOODS | ||
[2002/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UPM-Kymmene Oyj Eteläesplanadi 2 00170 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states UPM-Kymmene Oyj Eteläesplanadi 2 00170 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [1997/26] | For all designated states UPM-Kymmene Oy Snellmaninkatu 13 00170 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSKINEN, Erkki Sitomantie 3 FIN-28360 Pori / FI | [1997/26] | Representative(s) | Salonen, Esko Tapani, et al Forssén & Salomaa Oy Lautatarhankatu 8 B 00580 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | Salonen, Esko Tapani, et al Forssén & Salomaa Oy, Yrjönkatu 30 00100 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [1997/26] | Miettinen, Teuvo Seppo Aukusti, et al FORSSEN & SALOMAA OY, Yrjönkatu 30 00100 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 96922062.3 | 05.07.1996 | [1997/26] | WO1996FI00397 | Priority number, date | FI19950003354 | 07.07.1995 Original published format: FI 953354 | [1997/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9703002 | Date: | 30.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0779874 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0779874 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65D88/16, B65D33/02 | [1997/26] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/27] |
Former [1997/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER FÜR SCHUTTGUT | [1997/26] | English: | CONTAINER FOR BULK GOODS | [2002/20] | French: | CONTENEUR POUR MARCHANDISES EN VRAC | [1997/26] |
Former [1997/26] | CONTAINER MEANT FOR BULK GOODS | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/26] | 05.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07] | Request for further processing for: | 20.02.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.03.2002 | Decision despatched | 17.01.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 17.01.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.02.2003 | CH | 19.02.2003 | GR | 19.02.2003 | LI | 19.02.2003 | DK | 19.05.2003 | LU | 05.07.2003 | IE | 07.07.2003 | MC | 31.07.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/40] | AT | 19.02.2003 | |
CH | 19.02.2003 | ||
GR | 19.02.2003 | ||
LI | 19.02.2003 | ||
DK | 19.05.2003 | ||
LU | 05.07.2003 | ||
IE | 07.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 19.02.2003 | |
CH | 19.02.2003 | ||
GR | 19.02.2003 | ||
LI | 19.02.2003 | ||
DK | 19.05.2003 | ||
LU | 05.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 19.02.2003 | |
CH | 19.02.2003 | ||
GR | 19.02.2003 | ||
LI | 19.02.2003 | ||
DK | 19.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 19.02.2003 | |
CH | 19.02.2003 | ||
GR | 19.02.2003 | ||
LI | 19.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | CH | 19.02.2003 | |
GR | 19.02.2003 | ||
LI | 19.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 19.02.2003 | |
LI | 19.02.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0376622 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]); | [A]NO171359B (BOOTS GERARDUS A M); | [A]WO9317911 (ROSENLEW AB OY W [FI]) | Examination | US5149315 |