EP0839304 - DISTRIBUTOR FOR A HEATING OR COOLING INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/19] | DISTRIBUTOR COMPRISED BY A ONE-PIPE-SYSTEM FOR A HEATING OR COOLING APPARATUS | ||
[2000/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tour & Andersson Hydronics AB 524 30 Ljung / SE | [1998/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGELBREKTSSON, Anders Vinkelgatan 10 S-524 32 Herrljunga / SE | 02 /
RYDEN, Claes Solbacken 2 S-523 00 Ulricehamn / SE | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Siebmanns, Hubertus, et al Gotapatent AB, Box 154 561 22 Huskvarna / SE | [1998/19] | Application number, filing date | 96922329.6 | 25.06.1996 | [1998/19] | WO1996SE00828 | Priority number, date | SE19950002388 | 30.06.1995 Original published format: SE 9502388 | [1998/19] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9702457 | Date: | 23.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0839304 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0839304 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F24H9/12, G05D23/19 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
F24D19/0007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL [1998/19] | Title | German: | VERTEILER FÜR EINE HEIZ- ODER-KUEHLANLAGE | [2000/46] | English: | DISTRIBUTOR FOR A HEATING OR COOLING INSTALLATION | [2000/44] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR POUR UNE INSTALLATION DE CHAUFFAGE OU DE REFRIGERATION | [2000/44] |
Former [1998/19] | VERTEILER IN EINE EINROHRANLAGE FÜR EINES HEISS-ODER-KUHLGERÄT | ||
Former [1998/19] | DISTRIBUTOR COMPRISED BY A ONE-PIPE-SYSTEM FOR A HEATING OR COOLING APPARATUS | ||
Former [1998/19] | DISTRIBUTEUR COMPRIS DANS UN SYSTEME A UN TUYAU POUR UN EQUIPEMENT DE CHAUFFAGE OU DE REFRIGERATION | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.1997 | Translation filed | 15.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 15.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/19] | 21.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 29.08.2001 | CH | 29.08.2001 | LI | 29.08.2001 | ES | 28.02.2002 | [2015/21] |
Former [2004/04] | BE | 29.08.2001 | |
ES | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/29] | BE | 29.08.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]SE177097 ; | [A]US3618855 (NILSSON SVEN DAVID FERDINAND, et al); | [A]DE2344665 (FELLINGSBRO VERKSTADER FELLING [SE], et al); | [A]DE2355064 (MARKARYDS METALLARMATUR AB) |