EP0837701 - TERMINALLY STERILIZED OSTEOGENIC DEVICES AND PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STRYKER CORPORATION 2725 Fairfield Road Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | [2003/07] |
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states STRYKER CORPORATION 2725 Fairfield Road Kalamazoo, MI 49002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUCKER, Marjorie, M. 132 Robert Road Holliston, MA 01746 / US | 02 /
RUEGER, David, C. 19 Downey Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | 03 /
SAMPATH, Kuber, T. 6 Spring Street Medway, MA 02053 / US | [1998/18] | Representative(s) | Price, Vincent Andrew, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Price, Vincent Andrew, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 96922473.2 | 07.06.1996 | [1998/18] | WO1996US10377 | Priority number, date | US19950478452 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 478452 | [1998/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9640297 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0837701 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0837701 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/08, A61L27/00 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
A61L2/007 (EP,US);
A61L2/0011 (EP,US);
A61L2/0035 (EP,US);
A61L27/12 (EP,US);
A61L27/20 (EP,US);
A61L27/227 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/20, C08L1/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/18] | Title | German: | TERMINAL-STERILISIERTE OSTEOGENE VORRICHTUNGEN UND IHRE HERSTELLUNG | [1998/18] | English: | TERMINALLY STERILIZED OSTEOGENIC DEVICES AND PREPARATION THEREOF | [1998/18] | French: | PRODUITS OSTEOGENIQUES STERILISES EN FIN DE FABRICATION ET LEUR PREPARATION | [1998/18] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 30.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 11.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03001900.4 | EP03075141.6 / EP1334733 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.02.2003 | BE | 12.02.2003 | CH | 12.02.2003 | FI | 12.02.2003 | GR | 12.02.2003 | LI | 12.02.2003 | NL | 12.02.2003 | DK | 12.05.2003 | PT | 12.05.2003 | SE | 12.05.2003 | LU | 07.06.2003 | IE | 09.06.2003 | MC | 30.06.2003 | ES | 28.08.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 12.02.2003 | |
BE | 12.02.2003 | ||
CH | 12.02.2003 | ||
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
DK | 12.05.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
LU | 07.06.2003 | ||
IE | 09.06.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 12.02.2003 | |
BE | 12.02.2003 | ||
CH | 12.02.2003 | ||
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
DK | 12.05.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
IE | 09.06.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 12.02.2003 | |
BE | 12.02.2003 | ||
CH | 12.02.2003 | ||
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
DK | 12.05.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 12.02.2003 | |
CH | 12.02.2003 | ||
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
DK | 12.05.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 12.02.2003 | |
CH | 12.02.2003 | ||
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
DK | 12.05.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 12.02.2003 | |
CH | 12.02.2003 | ||
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | CH | 12.02.2003 | |
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | CH | 12.02.2003 | |
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | CH | 12.02.2003 | |
FI | 12.02.2003 | ||
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
NL | 12.02.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 12.02.2003 | |
LI | 12.02.2003 | ||
SE | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/32] | SE | 12.05.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0361896 (COLLAGEN CORP [US]) [Y] 16* claims 5,7 *; | [Y]WO9316739 (EBERLIN JEAN LUC [CH]) [Y] 1-15,17,18,20,21 * claim 5 *; | [Y]EP0567391 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [Y] 1-18,20,21 * column 1, line 35; claims 1,3,6 * | Examination | - "Effect of Sterilization on Bone Morphogenetic Protein", Ijiri et al., p.628-636, Journal of Orthopaedic Research, vol.12, no.5, 1994 |