EP0845026 - MULTICOMPONENT SYSTEM FOR USE WITH DETERGENT SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2006 [2006/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Call, Krimhild Heinsberger Strasse 14a 52531 Übach-Palenberg / DE | [1998/34] |
Former [1998/23] | For all designated states CALL, Hans-Peter Dr. Heinsbergerstr. 14A 52531 Übach-Palenberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Call, Hans-Peter Heinsberger Strasse 14a 52531 Übach-Palenberg / DE | [1998/34] |
Former [1998/23] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1999/25] |
Former [1998/23] | von Creytz, Dietrich, Dipl.-Phys., et al Tannenweg 25 41844 Wegberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96922848.5 | 19.06.1996 | [1998/23] | WO1996EP02658 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9748786 | Date: | 24.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0845026 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/39, C11D3/386 | [1998/23] | CPC: |
C11D3/30 (EP);
C11D3/2034 (EP);
C11D3/2068 (EP);
C11D3/2072 (EP);
C11D3/28 (EP);
C11D3/38654 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1998/23] | Title | German: | MEHRKOMPONENTENSYSTEM ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT WASCHAKTIVEN SUBSTANZEN | [1998/23] | English: | MULTICOMPONENT SYSTEM FOR USE WITH DETERGENT SUBSTANCES | [1998/23] | French: | SYSTEME MULTICOMPOSANT DESTINE A ETRE UTILISE AVEC DES SUBSTANCES DETERSIVES | [1998/23] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/23] | 07.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/04] | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/04] | Request for further processing for: | 28.09.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 28.09.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   03.01.2000 | 30.06.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2000 | 30.06.2001 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2001 | 30.06.2002 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2002 | 30.06.2003 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2003 | 30.06.2004 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2005 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]DE4445088 (IBV IND BIOVERFAHREN) [E] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9429425 (CALL HANS PETER) [DA] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9412621 (NOVO NORDISK) [DA] 1-4,36 * claims 23-50 *; | [A]WO9313193 (NOVONORDISK) [A] 1-7,22,26,29,36-38 * page 6, line 11 - line 24; claims 1,7-11,20-26 *; | [A]WO9501426 (NOVONORDISK) [A] 1-6,26,36-38 * claims 23-50 *; | [DA]DE1918729 (COLGATE-PALMOLIVE) [DA] 1-4,6,7,22,30 * claim - * |