EP0840567 - IMPLANTABLE SENSOR AND SYSTEM FOR MEASUREMENT AND CONTROL OF BLOOD CONSTITUENT LEVELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY 1020 Locust Street Philadelphia PA 19107 / US | For all designated states Animas Corporation 3223 Phoenixville Pike Malvern, PA 19355 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY 1020 Locust Street Philadelphia, PA 19107 / US | ||
For all designated states Animas Corporation 3223 Phoenixville Pike Malvern, PA 19355 / US | |||
Former [1998/20] | For all designated states THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY 1020 Locust Street Philadelphia, PA 19107 / US | ||
For all designated states Crothall, Katherine D. 141 Maple Hill Road Gladwyne, PA 19035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSEPH, Jeffrey, I. 1335 June Lane Penn Valley, PA 19072 / US | 02 /
SUN, Xiaoguang 516 Valleywyck Drive King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 03 /
CROTHALL, Katherine, D. 141 Maple Hill Road Gladwyne, PA 19035 / US | [1998/20] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1998/20] | Fuchs Mehler Weiss Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 96923706.4 | 08.07.1996 | [1998/20] | WO1996US11435 | Priority number, date | US19950500388 | 06.07.1995 Original published format: US 500388 | [1998/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9701986 | Date: | 23.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0840567 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.01.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61M5/142 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
A61M5/14276 (EP,US);
A61B5/0031 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/1459 (EP,US);
A61B5/412 (EP,US);
A61B5/6876 (EP,US);
A61B5/6884 (EP,US);
A61B5/029 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3507 (EP,US);
A61M5/1723 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/20] | A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/20] | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARER SENSOR UND ANORDNUNG ZUR MESSUNG UND REGELUNG DES GEHALTES VON BLUTBESTANDTEILEN | [1998/20] | English: | IMPLANTABLE SENSOR AND SYSTEM FOR MEASUREMENT AND CONTROL OF BLOOD CONSTITUENT LEVELS | [1998/20] | French: | CAPTEUR ET SYSTEME IMPLANTABLES DE MESURE ET DE REGULATION DE TAUX DE CONSTITUANTS SANGUINS | [1998/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.1998 | Search fee paid | 03.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/20] | 14.01.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/49] | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4704029 (VAN HEUVELEN ALAN [US]) [X] 1,2,18,44,63 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 21 * * column 6, line 32 - column 7, line 33; tables 4,5 * [A] 7,11-14,17,19,21,22,25-27,35-38,45,47,65,67,68,71-73,84,86,87; | [A]WO9211801 (OEBERG AAKE [SE], et al) [A] 1,2,18,25,44,63,84,86 * page 1, line 11 - line 34 ** page 3, line 19 - page 7, line 22; tables 1-6 * | International search | [X]US4807629 (BAUDINO MICHAEL D [US], et al); | [Y]US4865038 (RICH DAVID [US], et al); | [Y]US5127406 (YAMAGUCHI KAZUO [JP]); | [X]US5305745 (ZACOUTO FRED [FR]); | [Y]US5353792 (LUEBBERS DIETRICH W [DE], et al); | [YP]US5474552 (PALTI YORAM [IL]) |