EP0889936 - CATIONICALLY POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITIONS CAPABLE OF BEING APPLIED BY ELECTROSTATIC ASSISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVERAERTS, Albert, I. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
LAMANNA, William, M. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
SEAVER, Albert, E. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
TIERS, George, V. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 96924380.7 | 09.07.1996 | [1999/02] | WO1996US11397 | Priority number, date | US19960622102 | 26.03.1996 Original published format: US 622102 | [1999/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9735929 | Date: | 02.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0889936 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0889936 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09D4/00, C09J7/02, B05D1/00, B05D1/04 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
C07D265/30 (EP);
C09D4/00 (EP,KR);
C07C311/48 (EP);
C07C317/04 (EP);
C07D285/15 (EP);
C07D303/20 (EP);
C07D339/06 (EP);
C07F5/027 (EP);
C08F12/30 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08F220/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/02] | Title | German: | KATIONISCH POLYMERISIERBARE ZUSMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE ZUR BESCHICHTUNG IN EINEM ELEKTROSTATISCHEN VERFAHREN VERWENDET WERDEN KÖNNEN | [1999/02] | English: | CATIONICALLY POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITIONS CAPABLE OF BEING APPLIED BY ELECTROSTATIC ASSISTANCE | [1999/02] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POLYMERISABLES PAR LIBERATION DE CATIONS POUVANT S'APPLIQUER A L'AIDE D'UN PROCEDE ELECTROSTATIQUE | [1999/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 13.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00106797.4 / EP1020438 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.12.2001 | ES | 27.06.2002 | GB | 09.07.2002 | [2004/21] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 12.12.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3348965 (DRUM EDWARD W) [A] 1-18; | [A]FR2170215 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18; | [A]WO9407612 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US])[A] 1-18; | [DX]WO9503338 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DX] 1-12,14-18 * page 18, line 6 - line 19 *; | [DE]WO9627584 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DE] 1-12,14-18 * the whole document * * & ussn 08/558245 (Lamanna et al.) * |