EP0862757 - SHARED VIRTUAL DESKTOP COLLABORATIVE APPLICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2005 [2005/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diamond Multimedia Systems, Inc. 2880 Junction Avenue San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [1998/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WRIGHT, Daniel, W. Apartment 218,390 Elan Village Lane San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96924540.6 | 16.07.1996 | [1998/37] | WO1996US11765 | Priority number, date | US19950503453 | 17.07.1995 Original published format: US 503453 | [1998/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9704383 | Date: | 06.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0862757 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.02.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14, G06F9/44, G06F9/46 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
G06F3/038 (EP,US);
G06F9/451 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/37] | G06F3/14 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1998/37] | Title | German: | GEMEINSAMES KOLLABORATIVES APPLIKATIONSSYSTEM FÜR VIRTUELLES DESK-TOP-SYSTEM | [1998/37] | English: | SHARED VIRTUAL DESKTOP COLLABORATIVE APPLICATION SYSTEM | [1998/37] | French: | SYSTEME D'APPLICATION COMMUN DE BUREAU VIRTUEL PARTAGE | [1998/37] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.1998 | Search fee paid | 13.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 01.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/31] | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5379374 (ISHIZAKI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * column 7, line 6 - line 68 *; | [A]US4761642 (HUNTZINGER GREGORY G [US]) [A] 6 * abstract * * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 36 * | [A] - LENNIL P, "DEMYSTIFYING THE OS/2 PRESENTATION MANAGER", OS/2 DEVELOPER, (199309), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 70 - 79, XP000672965 [A] 1-10 * page 70, column L, line 1 - page 78, column L, line 2; figures 1-7 * | [A] - ABE T ET AL, "DISTRIBUTED COOPERATIVE CONTROL FOR SHARING APPLICATIONS BASED ON THE MERMAID MULTIPARTY AND MULTIMEDIA DESKTOP CONFERENCING SYSTEM", NEC RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, (19930101), vol. 34, no. 1, pages 122 - 131, XP000363016 [A] 1-10 * page 125, column L, line 13 - page 128, column R, line L; figures 4-7; tables I,II * | International search | [Y]US4860247 (UCHIDA NORIAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US4903218 (LONGO MARK [US], et al); | [Y]US5430838 (KUNO YOSHINORI [JP], et al); | [Y]US4761642 (HUNTZINGER GREGORY G [US]); | [Y]US5379374 (ISHIZAKI TAKESHI [JP], et al) |