EP0846269 - A METHOD OF DETERMINING THE DEGREE OF AGGREGATION OF THE BETA A4 PEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/24] | A METHOD OF DETERMINING THE DEGREE OF AGGREGATION OF THE $g(b)A4 PEPTIDE | ||
[1999/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharmaceuticals Inc. Route 202-206, P.O. Box 6800 Bridgewater, NJ 08807-0800 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Aventis Pharmaceuticals Inc. Route 202-206, P.O. Box 6800 Bridgewater, NJ 08807-0800 / US | ||
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL, INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati OH 45215-6300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOYAL, Shefali 34 Sycamore Way Warren, NJ 07059 / US | 02 /
PAUL, Joseph, West 3802 Tyler Drive Winterville, NC 28590 / US | 03 /
RIEDEL, Norbert, G. 1305 Timberbrooke Drive Bedminster, NJ 07921 / US | 04 /
SAHASRABUDHE, Sudhir, R. 3 Oldstone Lane Whippany, NJ 07981 / US | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/24] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96924657.8 | 23.07.1996 | [1998/24] | WO1996US12034 | Priority number, date | US19950515606 | 16.08.1995 Original published format: US 515606 | [1998/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9707403 | Date: | 27.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0846269 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0846269 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/50 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
G01N33/6896 (EP);
G01N33/68 (KR);
G01N33/50 (KR);
G01N2500/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/24] | Extension states | AL | 27.02.1998 | LT | 27.02.1998 | LV | 27.02.1998 | SI | 27.02.1998 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES AGGREGATIONSGRADES DES BETA A4-PEPTIDS | [2002/43] | English: | A METHOD OF DETERMINING THE DEGREE OF AGGREGATION OF THE BETA A4 PEPTIDE | [1999/52] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LE DEGRE D'AGREGATION DU PEPTIDE BETA A4 | [1999/52] |
Former [1998/24] | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES AGGREGATIONSGRADES DES BETA A4-PEPTIDE | ||
Former [1998/24] | A METHOD OF DETERMINING THE DEGREE OF AGGREGATION OF THE $g(b)A4 PEPTIDE | ||
Former [1998/24] | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LE DEGRE D'AGREGATION DU PEPTIDE $g(b)A4 | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.01.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 16.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   03.09.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0281922 (AVERBACK PAULL); | [A]WO9505604 (MOLECULAR GERIATRICS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1 * example 3; claim 20 *; | [A]WO9512815 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US]); | [DX] - H. LEVINE, "Thioflavine T interaction with synthetic Alzheimer's disease beta-amyloid peptides: detection of amyloid aggregation in solution.", PROTEIN SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 2, pages 404 - 410, XP000613188 [DX] 1,2 * the whole document * | [A] - G. PERRY ET AL., "Antibodies to the neuronal cytoskeleton are elicited by Alzheimer paired helical filament fractions.", BRAIN RESEARCH, (1987), vol. 420, pages 233 - 242, XP000612724 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-8993(87)91243-1 |