EP0854980 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR REDUCING LOAD CHANGE STRESSES IN A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOSS, Peter Bachstrasse 2 D-76694 Forst / DE | 02 /
ZHANG, Hong Brandlberger Strasse 138 D-93057 Regensburg / DE | [1998/31] | Application number, filing date | 96924756.8 | 20.07.1996 | [1998/31] | WO1996DE01332 | Priority number, date | DE1995138369 | 14.10.1995 Original published format: DE 19538369 | [1998/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9714886 | Date: | 24.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0854980 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0854980 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F02P5/15 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
F02P5/1504 (EP,US);
F02P5/15 (KR);
F02D41/0225 (EP,US);
F02D41/1498 (EP,US);
F02D2200/1015 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1998/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM REDUZIEREN VON LASTWECHSELSCHLÄGEN BEI EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [1998/31] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR REDUCING LOAD CHANGE STRESSES IN A MOTOR VEHICLE | [1998/31] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REDUIRE LES A-COUPS SOUS CHARGE ALTERNEE DANS UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [1998/31] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/31] | 30.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0655554 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1,3,7 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 54 * * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 8; figure 2 *; | [A]WO9313311 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 52, line 1 - page 58, line 2 *; | [DA]DE4239711 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE4021440 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1,7 * the whole document * |