EP0847447 - ELECTROCHEMICAL BIOSENSORS AND PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2000 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saicom S.R.L. Via Padriciano, 99 34012 Trieste / IT | [1998/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SVORC, Josef Zarnova 10 901 01 Prievidza / SK | 02 /
MIERTUS, Stanislav Pod Rovnicami 27 841 05 Bratislava / SK | 03 /
STREDANSKY, Miroslav Komenskeho 13 900 01 Modra / SK | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr., et al NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI Srl, Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96924868.1 | 03.07.1996 | [1998/25] | WO1996EP02919 | Priority number, date | IT1995MI01441 | 05.07.1995 Original published format: IT MI951441 | [1998/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9702359 | Date: | 23.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0847447 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0847447 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, G01N27/327 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
C12Q1/004 (EP,US);
Y10S435/82 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/25] | Extension states | SI | 23.01.1998 | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHE BIOSENSOREN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [1998/25] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL BIOSENSORS AND PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION | [1998/25] | French: | BIOCAPTEURS ELECTROCHIMIQUES ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1998/25] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/25] | 23.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 10.11.1999 | FI | 10.11.1999 | GR | 10.11.1999 | SE | 10.11.1999 | DK | 10.02.2000 | PT | 10.02.2000 | IE | 03.07.2000 | LU | 03.07.2000 | [2013/23] |
Former [2004/39] | BE | 10.11.1999 | |
FI | 10.11.1999 | ||
GR | 10.11.1999 | ||
SE | 10.11.1999 | ||
DK | 10.02.2000 | ||
PT | 10.02.2000 | ||
IE | 03.07.2000 | ||
LU | 03.07.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | BE | 10.11.1999 | |
FI | 10.11.1999 | ||
GR | 10.11.1999 | ||
SE | 10.11.1999 | ||
DK | 10.02.2000 | ||
PT | 10.02.2000 | ||
IE | 03.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/46] | BE | 10.11.1999 | |
FI | 10.11.1999 | ||
SE | 10.11.1999 | ||
DK | 10.02.2000 | ||
PT | 10.02.2000 | ||
IE | 03.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | BE | 10.11.1999 | |
FI | 10.11.1999 | ||
SE | 10.11.1999 | ||
PT | 10.02.2000 | ||
IE | 03.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | BE | 10.11.1999 | |
FI | 10.11.1999 | ||
PT | 10.02.2000 | ||
IE | 03.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | BE | 10.11.1999 | |
FI | 10.11.1999 | ||
PT | 10.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 10.11.1999 | |
PT | 10.02.2000 | ||
FI | 11.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/23] | FI | 11.02.2000 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0400918 (NAKANO VINEGAR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-9,11,15-28 * the whole document * * claim 11 * [Y] 12,14; | [A]EP0415124 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 4* the whole document *; | [A]WO9102485 (UNIV CITY [US]) [A] 1,11-14 * claims 1,5-12 *; | [DAY]EP0563795 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP], et al) [DA] 1-28 * the whole document * * page 10, line 37 * [Y] 6; | [X]US5269891 (COLIN FERNAND J G [BE]) [X] 1-28 * column 10 - column 11; claims 4-10 *; | [Y]WO9424548 (US COMMERCE [US]) [Y] 6,11-14 * the whole document *; | [Y] - C. URBANICZKY AND K. LUNDSTRÖM, "Voltametric studies on carbon paste electrodes; The influence of paste composition on electrode capacity and kinetics.", J. ELECTROANAL. CHEM., (1984), vol. 176, pages 169 - 182, XP000612293 [Y] 11-14 * See: Introduction and Conclusions (use of wax and hexadecane). * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0368-1874(84)83468-1 | [Y] - K. THAMPI, ET AL., "Photoelectrochemical cell with zinc oxide-liquid crystal electrode", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1981), vol. 94, no. 26, Database accession no. 216518, page 533, XP002020551 [Y] 14 * abstract * | [ ] - K.R. THAMPI ET AL., INDIAN J. TECHNOL., MADRAS, (1981), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 87 - 88 |