EP0848630 - AUTOMATIC BINDING AND UNLOCKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.08.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 27.09.2000 [2000/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salomon S.A. La Ravoire 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | [1998/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUELLAIS, Jacques Epagny F-74410 Saint-Jorioz / FR | [1998/26] | Application number, filing date | 96924962.2 | 10.07.1996 | [1998/26] | WO1996FR01072 | Priority number, date | FR19950010585 | 06.09.1995 Original published format: FR 9510585 | [1998/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9709098 | Date: | 13.03.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848630 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A63C9/20 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
A63C9/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [2000/11] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, NL | Title | German: | SKIBINDUNG UND AUTOMATISCHE AUSLÖSUNG | [1998/26] | English: | AUTOMATIC BINDING AND UNLOCKING DEVICE | [1998/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION ET DE DEVERROUILLAGE AUTOMATIQUE | [1998/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 01.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/39] | 19.05.2000 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0257282 (TMC CORP [CH]) [A] 1,8 * column 6, line 30 - line 37; figures 9,10 *; | [A]FR2645764 (SALOMON SA [FR]) [A] 1* figure 3 * |