EP0841997 - DRAWING PROCESS AND MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ballin, Felice Via Silvio Pellico, 17 10040 San Gillio / IT | [1998/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/21] | Representative(s) | Aprà, Mario Aprà Brevetti Via Bertola 2 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | Aprà, Mario Aprà Brevetti Via Bertola 2 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 96925742.7 | 12.07.1996 | [1998/21] | WO1996EP03067 | Priority number, date | IT1995TO00655 | 04.08.1995 Original published format: IT TO950655 | [1998/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9705972 | Date: | 20.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0841997 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0841997 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B21C1/16, B21C1/28, B21C1/30, B21C1/18 | [1998/21] | CPC: |
B21C1/16 (EP,US);
B21C1/18 (EP,US);
B21C1/28 (EP,US);
B21C1/30 (EP,US);
B21C1/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/21] | Extension states | AL | 16.02.1998 | LT | 16.02.1998 | LV | 16.02.1998 | SI | 16.02.1998 | Title | German: | ZIEHVERFAHREN UND MASCHINE | [1998/21] | English: | DRAWING PROCESS AND MACHINE | [1998/21] | French: | PROCEDE ET MACHINE D'ETIRAGE | [1998/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/21] | 11.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.06.1999 | BE | 09.06.1999 | FI | 09.06.1999 | GR | 09.06.1999 | IT | 09.06.1999 | NL | 09.06.1999 | SE | 09.06.1999 | LU | 12.07.1999 | IE | 09.08.1999 | DK | 09.09.1999 | PT | 09.09.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 09.06.1999 | |
BE | 09.06.1999 | ||
FI | 09.06.1999 | ||
GR | 09.06.1999 | ||
NL | 09.06.1999 | ||
SE | 09.06.1999 | ||
LU | 12.07.1999 | ||
IE | 09.08.1999 | ||
DK | 09.09.1999 | ||
PT | 09.09.1999 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 09.06.1999 | |
BE | 09.06.1999 | ||
FI | 09.06.1999 | ||
GR | 09.06.1999 | ||
NL | 09.06.1999 | ||
SE | 09.06.1999 | ||
IE | 09.08.1999 | ||
DK | 09.09.1999 | ||
PT | 09.09.1999 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 09.06.1999 | |
BE | 09.06.1999 | ||
FI | 09.06.1999 | ||
GR | 09.06.1999 | ||
NL | 09.06.1999 | ||
SE | 09.06.1999 | ||
IE | 09.08.1999 | ||
PT | 09.09.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 09.06.1999 | |
BE | 09.06.1999 | ||
FI | 09.06.1999 | ||
GR | 09.06.1999 | ||
SE | 09.06.1999 | ||
IE | 09.08.1999 | ||
PT | 09.09.1999 | ||
Former [2001/29] | AT | 09.06.1999 | |
BE | 09.06.1999 | ||
FI | 09.06.1999 | ||
GR | 09.06.1999 | ||
IE | 09.08.1999 | ||
PT | 09.09.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 09.06.1999 | |
BE | 09.06.1999 | ||
GR | 09.06.1999 | ||
IE | 09.08.1999 | ||
PT | 09.09.1999 | ||
FI | 10.09.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | AT | 09.06.1999 | |
BE | 09.06.1999 | ||
IE | 09.08.1999 | ||
PT | 09.09.1999 | ||
FI | 10.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | AT | 09.06.1999 | |
BE | 09.06.1999 | ||
PT | 09.09.1999 | ||
FI | 10.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 09.06.1999 | |
BE | 09.06.1999 | ||
FI | 10.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | BE | 09.06.1999 | |
FI | 10.09.1999 | Cited in | International search | [XA]BE372968 (PRESS-UND-WALZWERK AG) [X] 1,2 * page 8, paragraph 1; figure -; claims 2,5 * [A] 3; | [XA]US2674367 (FAULKNER WHITE LEONARD, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 7, line 19 - line 30 * * column 12, line 4 - column 13, line 7 * [A] 3-5,9,22; | [A]GB1116901 (GEORGE ANSLEY MITCHELL) [A] 12-14,17* page 4, line 7 - line 25; figure - *; | [XA]DE3010942 (OPPERMANN WILLI FRIEDRICH [DE]) [X] 1,3,12,15,18-21,23 * the whole document * [A] 16 |