EP0868419 - METHOD FOR PREPARING N,N-DIMETHYL-N'-PHENYLUREAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states U C B, S.A. 326, Avenue Louise, Bte 7 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [1998/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTHIJS, Guido Pinksterbloemstraat, 28 9030 Gent-Mariakerke / BE | [1998/41] | Application number, filing date | 96926275.7 | 01.08.1996 | [1998/41] | WO1996BE00081 | Priority number, date | GB19950016444 | 04.08.1995 Original published format: GB 9516444 | [1998/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9706134 | Date: | 20.02.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0868419 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C273/18 | [1998/41] | CPC: |
C07C273/1827 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C273/1827, C07C275/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON N,N-DIMETHYL-N'-PHENYL-HARNSTOFF | [1998/41] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING N,N-DIMETHYL-N'-PHENYLUREAS | [1998/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE N,N-DIMETHYL-N'-PHENYLUREES | [1998/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 21.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/28] | 16.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | CS243579 [ ] (CZECH.); | ES520096 [ ] (INDUSTRIA ESPANOLA DE PRODUCTOS ORGANICOS S. A. ;SPAIN (ES)); | [AD]US2655445 (C. W. TODD) [AD] 1-5 * claim - *; | [A]US3994714 (SCHULER MAX) [A] 1-5 * example - * | [AD] - W. SCHROTH ET AL., "Der Dimethylamin-Kohlendioxid-Komplex Dimcarb und seine präparative Verwendung", CHEMIKER ZEITUNG, vol. 113, pages 261 - 271, XP002013898 [AD] 1-5 * page 265, column R * | [AD] - SOPUCH T ET AL, "Continuous method for preparing N-aryl-N',N'-dimethylurea derivatives as herbicide intermediates", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890227), vol. 110, no. 9, Database accession no. 075080, XP002013899 [AD] 1-5 * abstract * | [AD] - SALES BARQUETS R ET AL, "Process for the preparation of substituted alkylarylureas useful as herbicides", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19871221), vol. 107, no. 25, Database accession no. 236251, XP002013900 [AD] 1-5 * abstract * |