EP0852548 - MASTER CYLINDER WITH SIMPLIFIED ADJUSTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.2002 [2002/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Systemes de Freinage 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [1998/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SACRISTAN, Fernando Bosch Systèmes de Freinage 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | [1998/29] | Representative(s) | Bentz, Jean-Paul BOSCH SYSTEMES DE FREINAGE 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | Bentz, Jean-Paul BOSCH SYSTEMES DE FREINAGE, 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 96926449.8 | 23.07.1996 | [1998/29] | WO1996FR01159 | Priority number, date | FR19950011303 | 27.09.1995 Original published format: FR 9511303 | [1998/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9711870 | Date: | 03.04.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852548 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0852548 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60T11/20 | [1998/29] | CPC: |
B60T11/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/29] | Title | German: | HAUPTZYLINDER MIT VEREINFACHTER EINSTELLUNG | [1998/29] | English: | MASTER CYLINDER WITH SIMPLIFIED ADJUSTMENT | [1998/29] | French: | MAITRE-CYLINDRE A REGLAGE SIMPLIFIE | [1998/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.07.1997 | Examination requested [1998/29] | 30.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]FR2312399 (GIRLING LTD [GB]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2361258 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 2; figure 1 * |